EP 0641027 A4 19951102 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE.
Title (en)
SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE.
Title (de)
HALBLEITERANORDNUNG.
Title (fr)
DISPOSITIF SEMICONDUCTEUR.
Publication
Application
Priority
- JP 14633092 A 19920513
- JP 9300621 W 19930512
Abstract (en)
[origin: WO9323878A1] It is an object of the present invention to provide a semiconductor device having a high current driving capability and capable of high-speed circuit operation. This device has a first semiconductor region of one conductivity type on a substrate; source and drain regions of the opposite conductivity type in the first region; a first insulating film on the substrate between the source and drain regions; and a conductive gate electrode on the first insulating film. The first insulating film comprises an insulator having a dielectric constant of 8 or more and its film thickness tI satisfies the following express (1). The source and drain regions are formed in a self-alignment manner with respect to the gate electrode: tI < 3 x ( epsilon r/ epsilon SiO2) (nm) (1) where epsilon r is the dielectric constant of the first insulating film, and epsilon SiO2 is the dielectric constant of the silicon oxide film.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
H01L 29/78 (2006.01); H01L 21/336 (2006.01); H01L 29/423 (2006.01); H01L 29/51 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
H01L 29/42364 (2013.01 - EP US); H01L 29/42368 (2013.01 - EP US); H01L 29/513 (2013.01 - EP US); H01L 29/517 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [PX] US 5134451 A 19920728 - KATOH TERUO [JP] & PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 15, no. 36 (E - 1027) 29 January 1991 (1991-01-29)
- [A] EP 0139764 A1 19850508 - MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 528 (E - 1004) 20 November 1990 (1990-11-20)
- [X] Y. W. HSUEH ET AL: "METAL-TiO2-SiO2-Si FIELD EFFECT TRANSISTOR", ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY.;EXTENDED ABSTRACTS OF BATTERY DIVISION. FALL MEETING, NEW YORK, OCT. 13-17 1974. VOL. 74 PART 2 ABSTRACT NO. 207, US, PRINCETON, ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY. 1974, pages 506 - 507
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2, no. 45 (E - 024) 27 March 1978 (1978-03-27)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 263 (E - 435) 9 September 1986 (1986-09-09)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE GB NL
DOCDB simple family (publication)
WO 9323878 A1 19931125; EP 0641027 A1 19950301; EP 0641027 A4 19951102; JP H05315608 A 19931126; US 5528068 A 19960618
DOCDB simple family (application)
JP 9300621 W 19930512; EP 93910326 A 19930512; JP 14633092 A 19920513; US 33587194 A 19941110