Global Patent Index - EP 0642966 B1

EP 0642966 B1 2000-12-06 - Rail scanner for lubricating the track

Title (en)

Rail scanner for lubricating the track

Title (de)

Schienenabtastung für Spurkranzschmieranlagen

Title (fr)

Balayeur de rails pour lubrifier le chemin de roulement

Publication

EP 0642966 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94113279 A

Priority

DE 4330571 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0642966A1] A rail scanner is proposed on a wheel flange lubrication device for scanning the running of the wheel flange of the rail vehicle on the rail (2), the pulse transmitter of which rail scanner which has the purpose of triggering lubrication pulses is an optical scanning device (3), preferably in the form of a photoelectric barrier which is evaluated in combination with an acceleration transmitter and/or angle of inclination transmitter and/or displacement sensor by an electronic control system. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61K 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61K 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61K 3/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0642966 A1 19950315; EP 0642966 B1 20001206; AT 197941 T 20001215; DE 4330571 A1 19950316; DE 4330571 C2 20011018; ES 2153847 T3 20010316

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040826

2005-08-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050825

2005-06-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-04-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-04-20 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040825

2005-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050301

2004-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040826

2004-08-25 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040825

2004-08-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040825

2003-12-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-10-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031022

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-08-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030813

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-08-07 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030807

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-07-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030729

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-07-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030728

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-07-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030728

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-07-16 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-07-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FLUHME GMBH

- Free text: DE LIMON FLUHME GMBH#ARMINSTRASSE 15#D-40227 DUESSELDORF (DE) -TRANSFER TO- FLUHME GMBH#ARMINSTRASSE 15#40227 DUESSELDORF (DE)

2003-07-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: DELIMON GMBH

- Free text: FLUHME GMBH#ARMINSTRASSE 15#40227 DUESSELDORF (DE) -TRANSFER TO- DELIMON GMBH#ARMINSTRASSE 15#40227 DUESSELDORF (DE)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153847 T3

2001-03-01 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

2001-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409602 20010111

2001-01-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001211

2000-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197941 T 20001215

1996-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19951120

1995-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950316

1995-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI