Global Patent Index - EP 0643171 B1

EP 0643171 B1 2000-07-26 - Means for spraying longitudinal road markings

Title (en)

Means for spraying longitudinal road markings

Title (de)

Linienmarkierungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de repassage des marquages routiers longitudinaux

Publication

EP 0643171 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 94402030 A

Priority

FR 9310852 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0643171A1] Device for reapplying longitudinal road markings (A), comprising a vehicle (10), one or two spray-gun assemblies (12, 13) which can be positioned vertically (14, 15, 16) and horizontally (18, 19, 20), transversely to the direction of advance of the vehicle, opening and closing (22, 23, 24) of the spray-gun assemblies also being adjustable. This device comprises a main (servo) control (slaving) means (UCP, 30, TS, MC) and has overall control of the position of the spray-gun assemblies (12, 13), their opening and closing sequences, as well as one or two means (UCL1, UCL2; 40, TS1, MC1; 40', TS2, MC2) which locally control at least the adjustment of the spray-gun assembly in question, transversely to the direction of advance of the vehicle (10). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 23/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 23/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 23/163 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0643171 A1 19950315; EP 0643171 B1 20000726; DE 69425354 D1 20000831; DE 69425354 T2 20010301; FR 2710084 A1 19950324; FR 2710084 B1 19960301

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-07-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090529

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070924

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-02-22 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-09-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050913

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-13 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20001026

2001-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010601

2001-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: GENERALE DE SIGNALISATION ROUTIERE

- Effective date: 20000930

2001-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ETAT FRANCAIS REPRESENTE PAR LE LABORATOIRE CENTR

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-11-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001017

2000-10-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-10-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DATA SOLLECITO LETT. INC.:02/03/2001;BUZZI, NOTARO

2000-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69425354 20000831

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2000-07-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000726

1999-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990913

1995-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950810

1995-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT