Global Patent Index - EP 0643180 B1

EP 0643180 B1 2000-08-16 - Profile for fixing a tensioned sheet and for hanging objects

Title (en)

Profile for fixing a tensioned sheet and for hanging objects

Title (de)

Profilleiste zur Befestigung von Spannbahnen und zum Hängen von Objekten

Title (fr)

Profil pour la fixation d'une feuille tendue et pour la suspension d'objets

Publication

EP 0643180 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94107251 A

Priority

DE 4315499 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4315499A1] The invention presents a profile strip with at least one tensioned-ceiling strip and a gallery strip. In this arrangement, the tensioned-ceiling strip serves for the releasable fastening of tensionable webs, with a device on which a hook-shaped border strip of the tensionable web can be fixed releasably with respect to a tensile force applied to the tensionable web. In this arrangement, the gallery strip of the profile strip serves for hanging objects, with a profile rail which can be connected displaceably to hanging elements. The tensioned-ceiling strip or strips and the gallery strip are connected to one another, and the profile strip has at least one device for fastening on a wall or a ceiling.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 9/30; A47G 1/16; B44C 7/02; E04B 9/00; E04B 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 1/16 (2006.01); E04B 9/00 (2006.01); E04B 9/30 (2006.01); H01R 25/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 25/14 (2013.01); A47G 1/1686 (2013.01); E04B 9/006 (2013.01); E04B 9/303 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH FR LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 4315499 A1 19941117; DE 4315499 C2 19970206; EP 0643180 A2 19950315; EP 0643180 A3 19950719; EP 0643180 B1 20000816

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KLUTH MARLENE

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050531

2006-03-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20051201

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2005-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KLUTH MARLENE

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-10 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050510

2004-06-15 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040615

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-06-08 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040608

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-06-01 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040601

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-05-24 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040524

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-05-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040519

- Year of fee payment: 11

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH FR LI LU NL

2000-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970317

1997-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970317

1996-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19951214

1995-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH FR LI LU NL

1995-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH FR LI LU NL