Global patent index - EP 0643758 B1

EP 0643758 B1 2000-01-05 - POLY(VINYL ETHER) AMINES AND FUEL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THE SAME

Title (en)

POLY(VINYL ETHER) AMINES AND FUEL COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING THE SAME

Title (de)

POLY(VINYLÄTHER)AMINE UND DIESE ENTHALTENDE BRENNSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN

Title (fr)

POLY(VINYLE ETHER) AMINES ET COMPOSITIONS DE CARBURANT CONTENANT CES AMINES

Publication

EP 0643758 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94911720 A

Priority

  • US 9403311 W
  • US 4107193 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5306315A] Poly(alkylene ether) amines having the formula: <IMAGE> (I) wherein A is an amine moiety having at least one basic nitrogen atom; R1 is a hydrocarbyl group having a sufficient number of carbon atoms to render the poly(vinyl ether) amine soluble in hydrocarbons boiling in the gasoline or diesel fuel range; R2 is an alkylene group having 2 to about 8 carbon atoms; R3, R4, R5, R6, R7 and R8 are each independently hydrogen or a lower alkyl group having 1 to about 4 carbon atoms; R9 is an alkyl group having 1 to about 10 carbon atoms; m is 0 or 1; and n is an integer from 5 to 99. The poly(vinyl ether) amines of formula I are useful as fuel additives for the prevention and control of engine deposits.

[origin: US5306315A] Poly(alkylene ether) amines having the formula: (* CHEMICAL STRUCTURE *) (I) wherein A is an amine moiety having at least one basic nitrogen atom; R1 is a hydrocarbyl group having a sufficient number of carbon atoms to render the poly(vinyl ether) amine soluble in hydrocarbons boiling in the gasoline or diesel fuel range; R2 is an alkylene group having 2 to about 8 carbon atoms; R3, R4, R5, R6, R7 and R8 are each independently hydrogen or a lower alkyl group having 1 to about 4 carbon atoms; R9 is an alkyl group having 1 to about 10 carbon atoms; m is 0 or 1; and n is an integer from 5 to 99. The poly(vinyl ether) amines of formula I are useful as fuel additives for the prevention and control of engine deposits.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10L 1/22; C07C 215/00; C07C 217/28; C08F 8/32; C10L 10/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07C 217/08 (2006.01); C07C 217/28 (2006.01); C10L 1/14 (2006.01); C10L 1/22 (2006.01); C10L 1/238 (2006.01); C10L 1/2387 (2006.01); C10L 10/00 (2006.01); C10L 1/16 (2006.01); C10L 1/18 (2006.01); C10L 1/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/238 (2013.01); C07C 217/28 (2013.01); C10L 1/143 (2013.01); C10L 1/2387 (2013.01); C10L 10/04 (2013.01); C10L 1/1608 (2013.01); C10L 1/1616 (2013.01); C10L 1/1641 (2013.01); C10L 1/1824 (2013.01); C10L 1/1852 (2013.01); C10L 1/1985 (2013.01); C10L 1/2383 (2013.01); C10L 1/305 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

US 5306315 A 19940426; CA 2136954 A1 19941013; DE 69422461 D1 20000210; DE 69422461 T2 20001012; EP 0643758 A1 19950322; EP 0643758 A4 19950927; EP 0643758 B1 20000105; JP H07508293 A 19950914; WO 9422987 A1 19941013

INPADOC legal status

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040325

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-03-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040325

2003-03-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030331

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-03-03 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030303

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-02-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030204

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-03-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69422461

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-10

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-04-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CHEVRON CHEMICAL COMPANY LLC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-12-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981028

1995-09-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 19950810

1995-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1995-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19941222

1995-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB