Global Patent Index - EP 0644517 B1

EP 0644517 B1 2001-05-30 - Arrangement and method of planning and testing a RTI system

Title (en)

Arrangement and method of planning and testing a RTI system

Title (de)

Anordnung und Verfahren zur Planung und Test einer RTI Anlage

Title (fr)

Agencement et procédé de conception et de test d'un système RTI

Publication

EP 0644517 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94850144 A

Priority

SE 9302982 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0644517A2] In a mobile system for short-range communication, mobile units or vehicles are moving within the coverage area (1) of the system. Beacons (VB, RB) are arranged to communicate with the mobile units for obtaining and delivering information respectively to the mobile units for determining traffic situations, road situations and so forth in the coverage area. As beacons, virtual beacons (VB) are included which are in connection with at least one higher-level unit (NBLT). In the last-mentioned unit, the virtual beacons are represented in tables, preferably through information on access telephone numbers and positions of the virtual beacons in the system. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/127; G08G 1/0967

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/0967 (2006.01); G08G 1/127 (2006.01); H04Q 7/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/096783 (2013.01); G08G 1/096716 (2013.01); G08G 1/096758 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0644517 A2 19950322; EP 0644517 A3 19960626; EP 0644517 B1 20010530; DE 69427329 D1 20010705; DE 69427329 T2 20020103; SE 9302982 D0 19930914; SE 9302982 L 19950315

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040302

2003-06-06 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020829

2002-10-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021024

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-08-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020829

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-10-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010817

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-07-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010717

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69427329 20010705

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2001-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2000-10-18 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD OF PLANNING AND TESTING A RTI SYSTEM

1999-02-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981222

1996-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960612

1996-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1996-06-19 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G08G 1/127

1995-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL