Global patent index - EP 0644527 B1

EP 0644527 B1 2000-05-17 - Terminal for mobile radio

Title (en)

Terminal for mobile radio

Title (de)

Mobilfunkendgerät

Title (fr)

Terminal pour radio mobile

Publication

EP 0644527 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94202647 A

Priority

  • EP 94202647 A
  • DE 4421853 A
  • EP 93115202 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0644527A2] The invention relates to a mobile radio terminal with a speech processing device for processing speech signals (x(i)) comprising noise and speech signal components. An estimating device (7) for continuous formation of estimated values (SNR(i)) of the signal-to-noise power ratio of the speech signals (x(i)) is provided through means for - determining the power values of speech signal sample values, - smoothing the power values, - determining in each case the minimum of a group of L consecutive smoothed power values (Px,s(i)), the groups following on continuously from one another and containing at least enough smoothed power values (Px,s(i)) to ensure that in each case all smoothed power values (Px,s(i)) associated with any given phoneme of the speech signal (x(i)) can be captured by a single group, - forming a current estimated value (SNR(i)) of the signal-to-noise power ratio from the current smoothed power value and the last determined minimum. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 21/0208 (2013.01); G10L 21/0216 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 21/0208 (2013.01); G10L 2021/02166 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0644527 A2 19950322; EP 0644527 A3 19950830; EP 0644527 B1 20000517

INPADOC legal status

2006-07-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050914

2006-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2005-09-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050914

2005-09-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050914

2004-11-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041115

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-09-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040929

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-09-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040927

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000616

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59409348

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-21

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 10L 21/02 A

2000-01-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: PHILIPS CORPORATE INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

2000-01-12 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

1999-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981119

1996-04-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960229

1995-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1995-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT