Global Patent Index - EP 0644691 B1

EP 0644691 B1 2001-12-12 - Compressed television signal recording and reproducing apparatus

Title (en)

Compressed television signal recording and reproducing apparatus

Title (de)

Gerät zur Aufzeichnung und Wiedergabe eines komprimierten Videosignals

Title (fr)

Appareils d'enregistrement et de reproduction de signaux vidéo comprimés

Publication

EP 0644691 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94114785 A

Priority

  • JP 23291693 A
  • JP 26331193 A
  • JP 28656593 A
  • JP 28793693 A
  • JP 28901293 A
  • JP 2103994 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0644691A2] The video signal input is converted to high-speed reproduction data by a high-speed reproduction data encoder 1. The video signal input is converted to high-speed reproduction data by a formatter 2, which formats the high-speed reproduction data so that the same data is recorded to n tracks; this becomes the recorded data. After the recorded data is input to an error correction encoder 3, it is decoded by a decoder 4 and recorded by a recording head 5 to the magnetic tape 6. During reproduction, the recorded data is reproduced by reproduction head 7 from the magnetic tape 6, and decoded by decoder 8. The decoded data is then error corrected by an error correction decoder 9, and then input to a deformatter 10. The deformatter 10 separates the normal reproduction data from the high-speed reproduction data, and separately outputs both data types. During normal reproduction, the normal reproduction data is output by a switch 13; the high-speed reproduction data is decoded to video data by a high-speed reproduction data decoder during high speed reproduction, and output. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 5/92; H04N 5/94; H04N 5/945

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/783 (2006.01); H04N 5/926 (2006.01); H04N 5/945 (2006.01); H04N 5/7826 (2006.01); H04N 9/804 (2006.01); H04N 9/82 (2006.01); H04N 9/888 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/783 (2013.01); H04N 5/9264 (2013.01); H04N 5/945 (2013.01); H04N 5/78263 (2013.01); H04N 9/8042 (2013.01); H04N 9/8227 (2013.01); H04N 9/888 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0644691 A2 19950322; EP 0644691 A3 19950927; EP 0644691 B1 20011212; DE 69429404 D1 20020124; DE 69429404 T2 20020822; KR 0157665 B1 19981116; US 6031959 A 20000229

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080920

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-07-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090529

2009-06-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080920

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070914

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070916

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070919

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-09-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070913

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69429404 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1998-03-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980116

1995-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1995-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940920

1995-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL