Global Patent Index - EP 0644730 B1

EP 0644730 B1 2000-12-06 - BOOT FOR SKIING AND THE LIKE

Title (en)

BOOT FOR SKIING AND THE LIKE

Title (de)

SKI- ODER SCHLITTSCHUH

Title (fr)

CHAUSSURE POUR SPORT DE GLISSE

Publication

EP 0644730 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 94906239 A

Priority

  • FR 9400128 W
  • FR 9303550 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9421149A1] A boot for skiing and the like, and snowboarding in particular, is disclosed. The boot (1) consists of two assemblies with differing features and functions, i.e. a relatively stiff power assembly (2A, 2B, 2C, 2D, 2F, 5) arranged around the foot in such a way that it centralises forces including those caused, in use, when foot pressure is applied forward or backward, and those exerted to control twisting; and a relatively flexible feel assembly (3A, 3B) which is separate from the power assembly, provides foot comfort and conveys information on the behaviour of the ski or the like to the ankle. Both of said assemblies are secured to a common reference member (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/00 (2006.01); A43B 5/04 (2006.01); A43B 7/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/0401 (2013.01); A43B 5/0405 (2013.01); A43B 5/0482 (2013.01); A43B 5/0492 (2013.01); A43B 7/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9421149 A1 19940929; AT 197880 T 20001215; DE 69426378 D1 20010111; DE 69426378 T2 20010510; EP 0644730 A1 19950329; EP 0644730 B1 20001206; FR 2702935 A1 19940930; FR 2702935 B1 19950609; JP H07507478 A 19950824; US 5499461 A 19960319

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-11-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071030

2006-02-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060220

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-02-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050203

2002-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-09-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020903

2002-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-02-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020203

2001-11-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010328

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-03-01 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DOTT. GIOVANNI LECCE & C.

2001-02-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010221

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69426378 20010111

2001-01-04 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010104

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-12-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197880 T 20001215

1996-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960517

1995-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19940614

1995-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI