Global Patent Index - EP 0644972 B1

EP 0644972 B1 2000-08-16 - SYSTEM FOR FIXING JUXTAPOSED AND PARALLEL SLATS

Title (en)

SYSTEM FOR FIXING JUXTAPOSED AND PARALLEL SLATS

Title (de)

BEFESTIGUNGSSYSTEM FÜR NEBENEINANDER UND PARALLEL GESETZTE LATTEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE FIXATION DE LATTES JUXTAPOSEES ET PARALLELES

Publication

EP 0644972 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 92910446 A

Priority

  • CA 9200215 W
  • CA 2136187 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9323636A1] The invention discloses a system for fixing slats (20), made of wood or similar material, and forming particularly a floor. The system allows to fix the slats (20) in a juxtaposed arrangement without damaging the slats owing to the use of tongues (10) wherein bearing elements (12) provided with teeths have been swaged. Said tongues (10) are placed on the subfloor (11) and are either fixed directly or held in place by gravity by means of flexible rubber supports (8) and of alignment slats (70) which maintain them at equal distance with respect to each other, thus without causing any damage to the subfloor (11). This fixing system provides for an easy installation and dismounting of slats (20) and is particularly appropriate for prevarnished wooden slats (20).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 13/08; E04F 13/10; E04F 15/04; E04F 21/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/26 (2006.01); E04F 13/08 (2006.01); E04F 13/10 (2006.01); E04F 13/21 (2006.01); E04F 15/00 (2006.01); E04F 15/04 (2006.01); E04F 21/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 21/1855 (2013.01); E04F 13/0803 (2013.01); E04F 13/10 (2013.01); E04F 15/04 (2013.01); E04F 2201/0517 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU MC NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9323636 A1 19931125; AT 195569 T 20000915; AU 1792692 A 19931213; CA 2136187 A1 19931125; CA 2136187 C 19990112; DE 69231365 D1 20000921; DE 69231365 T2 20010329; EP 0644972 A1 19950329; EP 0644972 B1 20000816; JP 2885938 B2 19990426; JP H07509030 A 19951005

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050521

2004-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040130

2004-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-01-14 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-12-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031202

2003-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TRIANGLE PACIFIC CORP.

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2003-05-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030521

2002-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020731

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020729

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-06-05 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020605

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020530

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-05-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020522

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-05-21 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010521

2001-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2000-11-16 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001116

2000-11-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001116

2000-11-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001006

2000-09-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69231365 20000921

2000-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU MC NL SE

2000-08-16 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-08-16 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-08-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-08-16 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-08-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195569 T 20000915

1996-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960531

1995-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19941216

1995-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU MC NL SE