EP 0645250 A3 19950607 - Printing machine with control panel.
Title (en)
Printing machine with control panel.
Title (de)
Druckmaschine mit einem Bedienungspanel.
Title (fr)
Machine d'impression avec tableau de commande.
Publication
Application
Priority
DE 4332561 A 19930924
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP0645250A2] In order to be able to set up and operate a printing machine (1) with a control panel (2) in a more universal manner, it is proposed according to the invention that the housing (6) or the like of the printing machine (1) has a panel receiver (3) to receive the removable control panel (2), the latter being connected via a cable (9) or, without a cable, via at least one infrared transmitter to the components of the printing machine (1) to be controlled, and the control panel (2) is fixed in the panel receiver (3) by means of at least one magnet (10) at least in the pulling-out direction. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B41J 3/46 (2006.01); B41J 29/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
B41J 3/46 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [YA] EP 0363507 A1 19900418 - SIEMENS AG [DE]
- [PA] EP 0597500 A2 19940518 - DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]
- [A] GB 2244846 A 19911211 - ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD [JP]
- [A] US 4934079 A 19900619 - HOSHI HATSUO [JP]
- [A] EP 0526248 A1 19930203 - POWERGRAPHIC DISPLAYS LTD [GB]
- [A] EP 0490481 A1 19920617 - OLIVETTI & CO SPA [IT]
- [YA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 077 (M - 801) 22 February 1989 (1989-02-22)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 497 (M - 1476) 8 September 1993 (1993-09-08)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 092 (C - 0811) 6 March 1991 (1991-03-06)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 504 (P - 1127) 5 November 1990 (1990-11-05)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0645250 A2 19950329; EP 0645250 A3 19950607; EP 0645250 B1 19970102; DE 4332561 A1 19950330; DE 59401455 D1 19970213; US 5513922 A 19960507
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 94113780 A 19940902; DE 4332561 A 19930924; DE 59401455 T 19940902; US 31157094 A 19940923