Global patent index - EP 0645258 B1

EP 0645258 B1 2000-05-10 - Colour ribbon cassette for a printing machine

Title (en)

Colour ribbon cassette for a printing machine

Title (de)

In Druckmaschinen einsetzbare Farbbandkassette

Title (fr)

Cassette à ruban coloré pour machine à imprimer

Publication

EP 0645258 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94113783 A

Priority

DE 4332608 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0645258A2] The invention relates to a printing machine having a cartridge (2) which contains a ribbon (7) and has two rotatably mounted cores (25,26,27,28) which are arranged with lateral spacing in a housing (18,19), the ribbon (7) being uncoiled from the one core (26), being moved past a print head (16) and being coiled onto the other core (28), and a through-bore (50) for inserting a receiving pin (52) of the printing machine (1) being formed on the housing (18,19). In order to be able to adjust the position of the ribbon (7) in an improved manner, it is proposed that the housing (18,19) bears against an adjusting ring (54) which can be displaced and fixed on the receiving pin (52). Alternatively or additionally it is recommended that a projecting guide plate (56) for the free strand (15) of the ribbon (7) is mounted pivotably on the housing (18,19), and that the length of the projecting cartridge arms (20,21) of the housing (18,19) is greater than that of the guide plate (56). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 32/00; B41J 17/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 17/30 (2006.01); B41J 17/32 (2006.01); B41J 32/00 (2006.01); B41J 35/04 (2006.01); B41J 35/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 17/32 (2013.01); B41J 32/00 (2013.01); B41J 35/28 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

DE 3723279 A1 19880121 - MONARCH MARKING SYSTEMS INC [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0645258 A2 19950329; EP 0645258 A3 19971126; EP 0645258 B1 20000510; DE 4332608 A1 19950330; DE 4332608 C2 20030109; DE 59409338 D1 20000615; DE 59410083 D1 20020418; DK 0645258 T3 20000918; EP 0960742 A1 19991201; EP 0960742 B1 20020313; ES 2148258 T3 20001016; JP H07228028 A 19950829; US 5553952 A 19960910

INPADOC legal status

2005-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20040903

2005-09-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-06-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2005-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-03 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-04-20 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040902

2005-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2004-09-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040903

2004-09-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040903

2004-09-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040902

2003-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030930

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-09-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030922

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-09-03 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030903

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-09-02 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030902

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-08-12 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030812

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-08-11 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030811

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-08-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030807

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2148258

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-09-18 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-06-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59409338

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-15

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

1999-09-01 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: COLOUR RIBBON CASSETTE FOR A PRINTING MACHINE

1999-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990225

1998-03-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: METO INTERNATIONAL GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1997-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971023

1997-12-17 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RHK1

- IPC: B41J 32/00

1997-11-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

1997-11-19 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RHK1

- IPC: 41J320/0

1995-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE