Global Patent Index - EP 0645401 B1

EP 0645401 B1 2001-12-05 - Process for producing polyolefins

Title (en)

Process for producing polyolefins

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Polyolefinen

Title (fr)

Procédé de préparation de polyoléfines

Publication

EP 0645401 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94114431 A

Priority

DE 4333128 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0645401A1] Polyolefins having a molecular weight distribution Mw/Mn of >/= 3, which can be monomodal, bimodal or multimodal, are obtained by polymerisation or copolymerisation of olefins using a catalyst system comprising an aluminoxane and a transition-metal component (metallocene), where the transition-metal component comprises at least one zirconocene of the formula I and at least one zirconocene of the formula Ia <IMAGE> or alternatively at least 2 zirconocenes of the formula I.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08F 10/06; C07F 17/00; C08F 4/642

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07F 17/00 (2006.01); C08F 2/00 (2006.01); C08F 4/60 (2006.01); C08F 4/64 (2006.01); C08F 4/642 (2006.01); C08F 4/646 (2006.01); C08F 4/6592 (2006.01); C08F 10/00 (2006.01); C08F 110/06 (2006.01); C08F 4/659 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08F 110/06 (2013.01); C07F 17/00 (2013.01); C08F 10/00 (2013.01); C08F 4/65904 (2013.01); C08F 4/65912 (2013.01); C08F 4/65916 (2013.01); C08F 4/65927 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08F 10/00 + C08F 4/65904
  2. C08F 110/06 + C08F 2500/15 + C08F 2500/05 + C08F 2500/17 + C08F 2500/04 + C08F 2500/01

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0645401 A1 19950329; EP 0645401 B1 20011205; AT 210158 T 20011215; CA 2133181 A1 19950330; DE 4333128 A1 19950330; ES 2169057 T3 20020701; FI 112236 B 20031114; FI 944480 A0 19940927; FI 944480 A 19950330; JP 3701333 B2 20050928; JP H07179512 A 19950718; US 5696045 A 19971209; US 5700886 A 19971223; US 6150481 A 20001121

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20130927

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120915

2013-10-21 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131021

2011-11-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110926

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091006

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100914

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59409990

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100914

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100914

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090929

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091002

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090929

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *NOVOLEN TECHNOLOGY HOLDINGS C.V.OOSTDUINLAAN 75,

- Effective date: 20061218

2007-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070401

2007-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070401

2005-08-16 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050816

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-09-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020914

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169057 T3

2002-05-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-02-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020130

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409990 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210158 T 20011215

2001-09-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH

2001-04-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990608

1998-03-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TARGOR GMBH

1995-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950929

1995-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE