Global Patent Index - EP 0645480 B1

EP 0645480 B1 2002-11-20 - FIBER WITH NETWORK STRUCTURE, NONWOVEN FABRIC CONSTITUTED THEREOF, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE FIBER AND THE FABRIC

Title (en)

FIBER WITH NETWORK STRUCTURE, NONWOVEN FABRIC CONSTITUTED THEREOF, AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE FIBER AND THE FABRIC

Title (de)

FASER MIT NETZWERKSTRUKTUR, DARAUS GEBILDETER VLIESSTOFF UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER FASER UND DES VLIESSTOFFES

Title (fr)

FIBRE A STRUCTURE RETICULEE, NON-TISSE CONSTITUE DE TELLES FIBRES, ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE LA FIBRE ET DU NON-TISSE

Publication

EP 0645480 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94912067 A

Priority

  • JP 8158493 A
  • JP 8158593 A
  • JP 10487093 A
  • JP 9400581 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0645480A1] An ultrafine fiber with a network structure, wherein the defect of an olefin polymer and that of an ester polymer have been offset while utilizing the merits of both polymers; and a nonwoven fabric constituted thereof and having a dense structure. This fiber is produced from a mixture consisting at least of an olefin polymer and an ester polymer which are mutually incompatible and has a network structure. It is highly fibrillated to such an extent as has been unattainable heretobefore, has high strength and modulus, and is dyeable. The nonwoven fabric contains network-structure fibers of a mixture of an olefin polymer with an ester polymer incompatible therewith in a ratio of 5/95 to 95/5, and these fibers are bonded to each other wholly or partly. It is excellent in strength, moisture permeability and water pressure resistance and is dyeable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01D 5/11; D04H 1/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01F 8/06 (2006.01); D01F 8/14 (2006.01); D04H 3/005 (2012.01); D04H 3/147 (2012.01); D04H 3/153 (2012.01); D04H 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/435 (2013.01); D01F 8/06 (2013.01); D01F 8/14 (2013.01); D04H 1/4291 (2013.01); D04H 1/4382 (2013.01); D04H 1/541 (2013.01); D04H 1/724 (2013.01); D04H 3/00 (2013.01); D04H 3/007 (2013.01); D04H 3/011 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB LU

EPO simple patent family

EP 0645480 A1 19950329; EP 0645480 A4 19950503; EP 0645480 B1 20021120; DE 69431745 D1 20030102; DE 69431745 T2 20030904; JP 3317703 B2 20020826; WO 9424347 A1 19941027

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120430

2013-02-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69431745

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120406

2013-01-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121228

2012-12-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120406

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110406

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110426

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110330

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-04-06 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030406

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69431745 20030102

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB LU

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

1997-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970325

1995-05-03 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

1995-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB LU

1995-05-03 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D01D 5/11

1995-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19941118

1995-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB LU