Global Patent Index - EP 0645686 B1

EP 0645686 B1 2000-03-22 - Circuit arrangement to supply electrical loads with a constant voltage

Title (en)

Circuit arrangement to supply electrical loads with a constant voltage

Title (de)

Schaltungsanordnung zum Versorgen von elektrischen Verbrauchern mit einer konstanten Spannung

Title (fr)

Circuit pour alimenter des charges électriques avec une tension constante

Publication

EP 0645686 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 93115240 A

Priority

EP 93115240 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0645686A1] Such a circuit arrangement is used especially for supplying sensors in a motor vehicle with a constant voltage required for accurate measuring results. It contains a reference voltage source (10) and a transistor (7) which is connected as emitter follower and by means of which the reference voltage is provided buffered at an output (4) as supply voltage for a sensor (3). A short circuit current through the transistor (7) is limited by a first current source (6). A diode (8) compensates for the voltage drop across the base-emitter path of the transistor (7). A second current source (9) drives a constant current through the diode (8). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05F 1/577; G05F 1/569

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05F 1/569 (2006.01); G05F 1/577 (2006.01); H02J 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05F 1/569 (2013.01); G05F 1/577 (2013.01); H02J 5/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0645686 A1 19950329; EP 0645686 B1 20000322; DE 59309986 D1 20000427; US 5592075 A 19970107

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2007-06-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070403

2005-11-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051121

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-09-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050912

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-05-11 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040921

2004-09-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040921

2003-09-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030904

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59309986 20000427

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000324

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1995-08-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19950626

1995-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950424

1995-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB