Global Patent Index - EP 0646187 B1

EP 0646187 B1 2001-01-10 - NON-CHROMATED OXIDE COATING FOR ALUMINUM SUBSTRATES

Title (en)

NON-CHROMATED OXIDE COATING FOR ALUMINUM SUBSTRATES

Title (de)

NICHT-CHROMATIERTE OXIDÜBERZÜGE FÜR ALUMINIUMSUBSTRATE

Title (fr)

COUCHE D'OXYDE NON CHROMATE POUR SUBSTRATS EN ALUMINIUM

Publication

EP 0646187 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93914728 A

Priority

  • EP 9301630 W
  • US 90385392 A
  • CN 93101737 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9400619A1] (A) A process for forming a cobalt conversion coating on a metal substrate, thereby imparting corrosion resistance and paint adhesion properties. The invention was developed as a replacement for the prior art chromic acid process. The process includes the steps of: (a) providing a cobalt conversion solution comprising an aqueous solution containing a soluble cobalt-III hexavalent complex, the concentration of the cobalt-III hexavalent complex being from about 0.01 mole per liter of solution to the solubility limit of the cobalt-III hexavalent complex; and (b) contacting the substrate with the solution for a sufficient amount of time, whereby the cobalt conversion coating is formed. The substrate may be aluminum or aluminum alloy, as well as Cd plated, Zn plated, Zn-Ni plated, and steel. The cobalt-III hexavalent complex may be present in the form of Mem(Co(R)6)n, wherein Me is Na, Li, K, Ca, Zn, Mg, or Mn, and wherein m is 2 or 3, n is 1 or 2, and R is a carboxylate having from 1 to 5 C atoms. (B) A chemical conversion coating solution for producing the cobalt conversion coating on a metal substrate, the solution including an aqueous solution containing a soluble cobalt-III hexavalent complex, the concentration of the cobalt-III hexavalent complex being from about 0.01 mole per liter of solution to the solubility limit of the cobalt-III hexavalent complex. (C) A coated article exhibiting acceptable corrosion resistance and paint adhesion properties, the article including: (a) a metal substrate; and (b) a cobalt conversion coating formed on the substrate, the cobalt conversion coating including aluminum oxide Al2O3 as the largest volume percent, and cobalt oxides CoO, Co2O3, and Co3O4.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 22/68; C23C 22/06; C23C 22/60; C23C 22/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 22/56 (2006.01); C23C 22/66 (2006.01); C23C 22/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 22/56 (2013.01); C23C 22/66 (2013.01); C23C 22/68 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9400619 A1 19940106; AT 198631 T 20010115; AU 4500893 A 19940124; AU 687740 B2 19980305; BR 9306602 A 19981208; CA 2138790 A1 19940106; CA 2138790 C 20041019; CN 1080963 A 19940119; CN 1090338 A 19940803; CN 1138873 C 20040218; CN 1195893 C 20050406; DE 69329853 D1 20010215; DE 69329853 T2 20010426; DK 0646187 T3 20010430; EP 0646187 A1 19950405; EP 0646187 B1 20010110; ES 2152950 T3 20010216; GR 3035554 T3 20010629; JP 3345010 B2 20021118; JP H07508311 A 19950914; MX 9303745 A 19940228; NO 315522 B1 20030915; NO 945026 A 19950224; NO 945026 D0 19941223; NZ 253699 A 19970526; RU 2135637 C1 19990827; RU 94046218 A 19961020; SG 43169 A1 19971017; ZA 9304544 B 19940318

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090624

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090623

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090623

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090624

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100107

2010-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090624

2010-07-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090623

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090623

2010-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090623

2010-02-08 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2010-01-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: THE *BOEING CY

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-05-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20080627

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-02-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080730

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-02-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080627

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080627

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080617

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080627

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080731

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20080626

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-10-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20080702

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080624

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080603

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080626

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-03-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152950 T3

2001-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69329853 20010215

2001-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ARNOLD & SIEDSMA AG

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

2001-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198631 T 20010115

2000-11-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO INGG. FISCHETTI & WEBER

1996-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19951211

1995-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950125

1995-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE