Global patent index - EP 0646335 B2

EP 0646335 B2 2000-09-27 - Inner shoe tongue for skiboot

Title (en)

Inner shoe tongue for skiboot

Title (de)

Innenschuhzungen für Schischuh

Title (fr)

Languette de chausson intérieur de chaussure de ski

Publication

EP 0646335 B2 (FR)

Application

EP 94810468 A

Priority

CH 265793 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0646335A1] The part of the boot concerned, in particular an inner-shoe (bootee) tongue for a ski boot, consists essentially of a leaktight, semirigid plastic outer part (1) having an alveolar structure (6) directly covered by a foam-type padding (4) and of a woven or knitted lining (5). The air enclosed in the cavities of the alveolar structure forms a shock-absorbing pad (padding) which is particularly effective in dynamic compression. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 5/04; A43B 23/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/04 (2006.01); A43B 23/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/0405 (2013.01); A43B 7/125 (2013.01); A43B 23/26 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0646335 A1 19950405; EP 0646335 B1 19970723; EP 0646335 B2 20000927; CH 689665 A5 19990813; DE 69404408 D1 19970904; DE 69404408 T2 19980205; DE 69404408 T3 20010419; US 5575090 A 19961119

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070811

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-07-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080430

2007-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-06-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060629

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-08-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050815

- Year of fee payment: 12

2000-12-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-09-27 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1998-06-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: PUMA AG RUDOLF DASSLER SPORT

- Effective date: 19980419

1997-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69404408

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 1997-09-04

1997-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1996-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19961014

1995-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19941114

1995-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT