Global patent index - EP 0647284 B2

EP 0647284 B2 2000-08-30 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR HEAT-TREATMENT OF A FIBER PRODUCT - NOZZLES ARE ELONGATED IN MACHINE DIRECTION

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR HEAT-TREATMENT OF A FIBER PRODUCT - NOZZLES ARE ELONGATED IN MACHINE DIRECTION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR WÄRMEBEHANDLUNG EINES FASERPRODUKTES, DIE DÜSEN ERSTRECKEN SICH IN RICHTUNG DER MASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR TRAITER PAR UN GAZ CHAUD UN PRODUIT FIBREUX, LES INJECTEURS ETANT DISPOSES LONGITUDINALEMENT DANS LE SENS DES FIBRES

Publication

EP 0647284 B2 (EN)

Application

EP 93909819 A

Priority

  • DK 9300154 W
  • DK 60692 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9323599A1] A method and an apparatus for treating a fibre product containing a thermocuring binder wherein oppositely directed gas streams are introduced into the fibre product opposites sides thereof in at least one zone from and wherein the gas streams introduced into the fibre product leave the fibre product on the same side as and in zones which are adjacent to the zones into which the gas streams are introduced into the fibre product.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06B 5/04; D06C 7/00; F26B 13/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06B 19/00 (2006.01); D06C 7/00 (2006.01); F26B 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 13/101 (2013.01); D06B 19/0052 (2013.01); D06C 7/00 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9323599 A1 19931125; AT 148509 T 19970215; AU 4061093 A 19931213; CZ 9402740 A3 19950315; DE 69307886 D1 19970313; DE 69307886 T2 19970731; DE 69307886 T3 20010329; DK 60692 D0 19920508; EP 0647284 A1 19950412; EP 0647284 B1 19970129; EP 0647284 B2 20000830; NO 302666 B1 19980406; NO 944226 A 19941104; NO 944226 D0 19941104; SK 134394 A3 19951011

INPADOC legal status

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090602

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080514

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-02-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100129

2010-01-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090510

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080514

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080515

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-01-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20010510

2001-11-09 [REG FR CL] CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENSES

- Ref Legal Event Code: CL

2001-05-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010510

2000-10-13 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2000-08-30 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

2000-05-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000510

- Year of fee payment: 8

1998-10-14 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: BABCOCK TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH

- Effective date: 19971024

1997-12-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: BABCOCK TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH

- Effective date: 19971024

1997-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

1997-04-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19970429

1997-03-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69307886

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 1997-03-13

1997-03-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

1997-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

1997-01-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19970129

1997-01-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Effective date: 19970129

1997-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 19970129

1997-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19970129

1997-01-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19970129

1997-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 148509

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 1997-02-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1996-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19951117

1995-04-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19941128

1995-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE