Global patent index - EP 0647391 B1

EP 0647391 B1 2001-03-14 - A construction for automatically milking animals

Title (en)

A construction for automatically milking animals

Title (de)

Konstruktion zum automatischen Melken von Tieren

Title (fr)

Dispositif de traite automatique d'animaux

Publication

EP 0647391 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94202889 A

Priority

NL 9301752 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0647391A2] The invention relates to a construction for automatically milking animals, such as cows, comprising a milking robot (8) for automatically connecting teat cups (14; 15; 16; 17) to the teats of an animal. The milking robot (8) includes a teat cup (14; 15; 16; 17) which is attached to the end of a loop-shaped tube, which tube can be distinguished in at least two portions, of which a first portion (74) is connected to the teat cup (14; 15; 16; 17) and is relatively rigid, while a second portion (75) of the tube (55; 56) is relatively flexible and allows the teat cup (14; 15; 16; 17) to move freely up and down and to reciprocate with respect to the milking robot (8). The first portion (74) of the tube is located in a horizontal plane, whilst the second portion (75) of the tube (55; 56) is in the shape of a loop and is predominantly located in a vertical plane. Consequently, the head (13) of the milking robot (8) can be arranged relatively low to the soil, without the tubes (55; 56) dragging along the soil. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01J 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01J 5/017 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01J 5/0175 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0647391 A2 19950412; EP 0647391 A3 19950614; EP 0647391 B1 20010314; DE 69426852 D1 20010419; DE 69426852 T2 20010913; NL 9301752 A 19950501

INPADOC legal status

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131006

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-08-07 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69426852

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140630

2014-06-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2014-05-21 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20140501

2013-03-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121024

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121029

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121107

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121029

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20031005

2003-10-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031005

2002-10-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021002

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-03-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69426852

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-19

2001-04-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL SE

2000-09-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAASLAND N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-08-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980629

1996-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19951201

1995-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL SE

1995-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL SE