Global Patent Index - EP 0647505 B1

EP 0647505 B1 2000-02-23 - Method and apparatus for the treatment of metallic workpieces, either coated or not

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for the treatment of metallic workpieces, either coated or not

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Behandlung von metallischen Werkstücken, die beschichtet oder nicht sind

Title (fr)

Procédé et installation de traitement de pièces métalliques revêtues ou non

Publication

EP 0647505 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 94402255 A

Priority

FR 9311999 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0647505A1] The invention relates to a method and to an installation for treating coated or otherwise metal workpieces. The installation comprises a shot peening tunnel (10) through which the workpieces to be treated are moved. Fans (36 to 42) make it possible to project at high speed jets of particles which are preferably made of zinc on to the workpieces to be treated. The workpiece is thus simultaneously cleaned and laden with zinc. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24C 11/00; B24C 3/14; C23C 4/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24C 3/14 (2006.01); B24C 11/00 (2006.01); C23C 2/26 (2006.01); C23C 24/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24C 3/14 (2013.01); B24C 11/00 (2013.01); C23C 2/26 (2013.01); C23C 24/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0647505 A1 19950412; EP 0647505 B1 20000223; EP 0647505 B2 20030827; DE 69423066 D1 20000330; DE 69423066 T2 20001102; DE 69423066 T3 20040311; FR 2710866 A1 19950414; FR 2710866 B1 19951229

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101031

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110630

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091119

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-05-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2009-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ENTREPOSE-MONTALEV

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071105

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071105

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-02-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071011

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071010

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-09-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: MAINTIEN DU BREVET DONT L'ETENDUE A ETE MODIFIEE

2003-08-27 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20030827

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR LI

2002-01-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ENTREPOSE ECHAFAUDAGES

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2001-01-24 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20001123

2000-08-11 [EN4] FR: NOTIFICATION OF NON FILING TRANSLATION IN AN EARLIER BOPI IS ERRONEOUS

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN4

2000-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2000-07-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-07-21 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-03-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69423066

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-30

2000-02-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR LI

1998-09-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980805

1995-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950628

1995-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR LI