Global Patent Index - EP 0648541 B1

EP 0648541 B1 2000-02-23 - Laboratory centrifuge with imbalance stop

Title (en)

Laboratory centrifuge with imbalance stop

Title (de)

Laborzentrifuge mit Unwuchtabschaltung

Title (fr)

Centrifugeuse pour laboratoire s'arrêtant en cas de déséquilibre

Publication

EP 0648541 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94115988 A

Priority

DE 4335119 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0648541A2] A laboratory centrifuge with a rotor which has vessel holders and a motor which drives the said rotor in rotation and has an upright shaft, the stator of which motor is mounted on the housing of the centrifuge by means of sprung suspensions, and with a deactivation device which controls the motor and which uses an element attached to the stator and an element attached to the housing to determine the deflection of the stator occurring at the maximum acceptable limit imbalance and switches off the motor, is characterised in that one of the two elements is constructed as a field generator which produces a constant field and the other element is constructed as a field strength detector, the field strength detector being connected to an evaluation device which brings about deactivation when specific changes in the field strength which are produced by the deflection occur. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B04B 9/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B04B 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B04B 9/146 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0648541 A2 19950419; EP 0648541 A3 19950920; EP 0648541 B1 20000223; AT 189863 T 20000315; DE 4335119 A1 19950420; DE 4335119 C2 19971120; JP 3448113 B2 20030916; JP H07275739 A 19951024; US 5496254 A 19960305

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20141010

2014-11-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 189863 T

- Effective date: 20141011

2014-11-05 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20141010

2014-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-10-14 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59409153

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131021

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20131011

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131022

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20131021

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131021

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NOVAGRAAF SWITZERLAND SA;CHEMIN DE L'ECHO 3;1213 ONEX (CH)

2010-07-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: EPPENDORF AG

- Free text: EPPENDORF AG#BARKHAUSENWEG 1#22339 HAMBURG (DE) -TRANSFER TO- EPPENDORF AG#BARKHAUSENWEG 1#22339 HAMBURG (DE)

2002-05-24 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-01-30 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: WILLIAM BLANC & CIE CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INDUSTRI

2001-12-14 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Free text: GERAETEBAU EPPENDORF GMBH TRANSFER- EPPENDORF ZENTRIFUGEN GMBH

2001-12-14 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: EPPENDORF ZENTRIFUGEN GMBH TRANSFER- EPPENDORF AG

2001-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: GERATEBAU EPPENDORF G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20001031

2001-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-11 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000523

2000-03-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409153 20000330

2000-03-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000223

2000-02-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2000-02-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000223

2000-02-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000223

2000-02-23 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000223

2000-02-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189863 T 20000315

1999-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990122

1996-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951123

1995-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

1995-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE