Global Patent Index - EP 0648834 B1

EP 0648834 B1 2000-05-17 - Carpet cleaner

Title (en)

Carpet cleaner

Title (de)

Teppichreiniger

Title (fr)

Agent de nettoyage pour tapis

Publication

EP 0648834 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94202969 A

Priority

  • US 13924093 A
  • US 30806794 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0648834A1] An aqueous cleaning composition for carpets, rugs, and textiles has been discovered with the composition comprising sodium lauryl sulfate, an ethylene glycol monohexyl ether, a fluorosurfactant, a carboxylated polymer salt, and a tetrasodium ethlyenediamine tetraacetate. The composition is effective in removing a variety of stains from carpeting and is particularly effective against oily stains without imparting undesirable properties on the cleaned surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/83; C11D 3/24; C11D 3/37; C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/33 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 1/00 (2006.01); C11D 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/2068 (2013.01); C11D 1/37 (2013.01); C11D 3/0031 (2013.01); C11D 3/33 (2013.01); C11D 3/3765 (2013.01); C11D 1/004 (2013.01); C11D 1/006 (2013.01); C11D 1/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0648834 A1 19950419; EP 0648834 B1 20000517; AT 193052 T 20000615; AU 675350 B2 19970130; AU 7586594 A 19950511; DE 69424492 D1 20000621; DE 69424492 T2 20010118

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051005

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061013

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070629

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061013

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2005-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051130

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-10-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051017

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-10-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051005

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-05-24 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69424492 20000621

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193052 T 20000615

1997-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970421

1995-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951011

1995-07-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RECKITT & COLMAN INC.

1995-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT