Global Patent Index - EP 0648863 B2

EP 0648863 B2 2001-05-02 - Enamellable oxide layer

Title (en)

Enamellable oxide layer

Title (de)

Emaillierbare Oxidschicht

Title (fr)

Couche d'oxyde émaillable

Publication

EP 0648863 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 94810572 A

Priority

CH 308193 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0648863A1] Aluminium-containing substrate for enamel coatings, comprising, at least on the areas intended for enamel coating, a surface layer of aluminium or an aluminium alloy and, on this surface layer, an oxide layer which constitutes an isotropic barrier layer with a thickness of from 0.01 to 1 mu m and a dielectric constant of between 5 and 10. Adjacent to this barrier layer there may also be a porous oxide layer with a thickness of from 0.1 to 10 mu m. An enamel coating having a thickness of, for example, from 50 to 200 mu m is applied to the substrate. The enamelled substrates can be employed as exterior panelling on vehicles or exterior facing on buildings, the enamel-coated substrates being outstandingly protected against external influences.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23D 3/00; C25D 11/04; C25D 11/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23D 3/00 (2006.01); C25D 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 11/04 (2013.01); C23D 3/00 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

  • S. Wernick et al:"The surface treatment and finishing of aluminium and its alloys"3. Auflage, 1964, Robert Draper Ltd., Teddington (GB), Seiten 260-266
  • R. Irmann: "Aluminiumguss in Sand und Kokille" 6.Auflage, 1959, Aluminium-Verlag GmbH, Düsseldorf(DE), Seiten 215-216
  • R.C. Weast: "Handbook of chemistry and physics" 53.Auflage, 1972-1973, CRC Press, Cleveland(US), Seite E-48
  • P. Barrand et al: "L'aluminium", Band 2, 1964, Editions Eyrolles, Paris (FR), Seiten 617 und 676-679
  • L. Young: "Anodic Oxide Films", 1961, Academic Press, New York(US), Seiten 211-218
  • B. Castel: "Les alumines et leurs applications", 1990, Aluminium Pechiney/Techno-Nathan, Seiten 51 und 56
  • G.E. Thompson et al: "Anodic films on aluminium" in G.C. Sculley: "Corrosion: Aqueous process and passive films", 1983, Academic Press, New York(US), Seite 229
  • W Hufnagel: "Aluminium-Taschenbuch", 14.Auflage, 1983, Aluminium-Verlag GmbH, Düsseldorf(DE), Seite 748

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0648863 A1 19950419; EP 0648863 B1 19980114; EP 0648863 B2 20010502; AT 162234 T 19980115; CH 686374 A5 19960315; DE 59405021 D1 19980219; DK 0648863 T3 19980914; DK 0648863 T5 20010129; ES 2112505 T3 19980401; ES 2112505 T5 20010701

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2013-04-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130418

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-06-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120531

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100928

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100930

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100927

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-09-03 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ALUSUISSE TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT A.G.

- Effective date: 20040930

2005-06-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-06-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-05-31 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-05-18 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040930

2005-05-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ALUSUISSE TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT A.G.

- Effective date: 20040930

2005-03-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2004-10-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-09-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2003-10-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031002

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-09-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030925

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-09-24 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030924

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-09-23 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030923

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-09-22 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030922

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-09-22 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030922

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-09-19 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030919

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-08-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030829

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-08-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20030829

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-07 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2001-08-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2001-07-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2001-07-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2001-07-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20010525

2001-05-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2001-05-23 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-05-02 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2001-01-29 [REG DK T5] CORRECTED TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

1999-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: PECHINEY

1998-12-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PECHINEY

- Effective date: 19981008

1998-09-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

1998-05-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 19980219

1998-04-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1998-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2112505 T3

1998-02-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59405021 19980219

1998-02-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19980116

1998-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

1998-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

1998-01-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 162234 T 19980115

1996-10-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALUSUISSE TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT AG

1996-09-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960729

1995-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951019

1995-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE