Global Patent Index - EP 0648872 B1

EP 0648872 B1 2001-05-09 - Fault detector and indicator for spinning station

Title (en)

Fault detector and indicator for spinning station

Title (de)

Spinnstellenstörmelder und -qualifizierer

Title (fr)

Détecteur et indicateur de défaut pour une unité de filature d'un métier à filer

Publication

EP 0648872 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94116410 A

Priority

DE 4335459 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0648872A1] A device for indicating spinning-station faults and for qualifying them is proposed. Also proposed is a method for recording and evaluating faults which have occurred on a yarn-spinning station, according to which the abovementioned fault indicator can operate. In order to increase the operating effectiveness of the spinning machine and in order, when a fault occurs in the yarn or in another electrical or mechanical device of the spinning machine, to induce a reaction appropriate to the hierarchy or quality of the fault indication, the parameter signal of the yarn obtained from a measuring device (20) is fed to an evaluation stage (21, 22) which transmits the fault-indication signals. These are assigned to fault groups (A, B, C, D) predetermined in an assignment section (23) provided directly at the spinning station. The output signals from the assignment section in each case represent a group of faults which (automatically) induce graded fault-elimination reactions. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 13/22; B65H 63/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 63/00 (2006.01); B65H 63/06 (2006.01); B65H 69/00 (2006.01); D01H 13/14 (2006.01); D01H 13/22 (2006.01); D01H 13/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 13/22 (2013.01); B65H 63/00 (2013.01); B65H 63/062 (2013.01); B65H 69/00 (2013.01); B65H 2557/65 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0648872 A1 19950419; EP 0648872 B1 20010509; EP 0648872 B2 20080702; CZ 288653 B6 20010815; CZ 9402570 A3 19951115; DE 4335459 A1 19950420; DE 4335459 C2 19991202; US 5799476 A 19980901

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091018

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061031

2009-05-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081022

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081103

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-07-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2008-07-02 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20080702

2008-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI

2008-06-25 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: RIETER INGOLSTADT GMBH

2008-02-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20071029

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-02-13 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: OERLIKON TEXTILE GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20020207

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *RIETER INGOLSTADT SPINNEREIMASCHINENBAU A.G.

- Effective date: 20061031

2005-10-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20051024

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-03-03 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20020207

2002-04-10 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: W. SCHLAFHORST AG & CO

- Effective date: 20020207

2001-07-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: RACHELI & C. S.R.L.

2001-07-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409744 20010613

2001-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI

1997-02-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970107

1995-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951019

1995-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI