Global patent index - EP 0649057 B1

EP 0649057 B1 2000-01-12 - A photographic processing composition and a processing process therewith

Title (en)

A photographic processing composition and a processing process therewith

Title (de)

Photographische Verarbeitungszusammensetzung und zugehöriges Verarbeitungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Composition de traitement photographique et méthode de traitement l'utilisant

Publication

EP 0649057 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94116246 A

Priority

JP 25837293 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0649057A2] A processing composition for a silver halide photographic material, which comprises at least one of Fe (III), Mn (III), Co (III), Rh (II), Rh (III), Au (II), Au (III), and Ce (IV) chelate compounds of a compound represented by formula (I) or a salt thereof: <CHEM> wherein R<1> represents a hydrogen atom, an aliphatic group or an aromatic group; R<2> represents an aromatic group; L<3> represents a divalent aliphatic group; n represents 0 or 1; X<1> represents a hydrogen atom or -L<4>-A<2>; L<1>, L<2> and L<4> each represents a divalent aliphatic group, a divalent aromatic group, or a divalent linkage group comprising a combination thereof; A<1> and A<2> each represent a carboxy group, a phosphono group, a sulfo group, or a hydroxy group; and Z represents an oxygen atom or a sulfur atom.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 7/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07C 237/06 (2006.01); C07C 237/08 (2006.01); C07C 237/12 (2006.01); C07C 309/51 (2006.01); C07F 9/38 (2006.01); C09K 3/00 (2006.01); G03C 7/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 7/42 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0649057 A2 19950419; EP 0649057 A3 19950920; EP 0649057 B1 20000112; DE 69422578 D1 20000217; DE 69422578 T2 20000615; JP 3075657 B2 20000814; JP H07114161 A 19950502

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-08-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69422578

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110502

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091014

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090917

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081008

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-05-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-05 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT; NO LEGAL EFFECT FROM

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69422578

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000217

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2000-01-12 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

1996-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19960208

1996-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951211

1995-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

1995-07-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD.

1995-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL