Global patent index - EP 0649268 B1

EP 0649268 B1 2000-07-26 - Appliance for the signal transmission from an amplifier to a loudspeaker

Title (en)

Appliance for the signal transmission from an amplifier to a loudspeaker

Title (de)

Vorrichtung für die Signalübertragung von einem Verstärker auf einen Lautsprecher

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la transmission des signaux d'un amplificateur sur un haut-parleur

Publication

EP 0649268 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94116020 A

Priority

DE 4334961 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0649268A1] A device for transmitting signals from an amplifer (8) to a loudspeaker (9) consists of a cable (1) having a number of forward and return conductors (2, 2') electrically connected to one another at their ends and a sound modification element (14) which exhibits a series inductance (L1, L2) and a series resistor (R1, R2). Using the sound modification element (14), the cable (1) can be optimally adapted to the given loudspeaker/amplifier combination (8, 9). The signal transmission device also exhibits an attenuator (13) at the cable end at the load. The attenuator (13) suppresses the tendency to oscillation of the amplifer which can occur in the case of cables having a high capacitance. In particular, long cable lengths which lead to a particularly high capacitance, thus do not present any problems in the signal transmission device according to the invention. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 3/00; H04R 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 3/00 (2006.01); H04R 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 3/00 (2013.01); H04R 3/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0649268 A1 19950419; EP 0649268 B1 20000726; AT 195050 T 20000815; DE 4334961 A1 19950420

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071221

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-12-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061222

- Year of fee payment: 13

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2001-01-24 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-12-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59409459

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-31

2000-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-07-26 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 195050

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990929

1995-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950926

1995-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI