Global Patent Index - EP 0649605 B1

EP 0649605 B1 2000-03-15 - Method and device for separating tobacco fibres

Title (en)

Method and device for separating tobacco fibres

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Vereinzeln von Tabakfasern

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour séparer des fibres de tabac

Publication

EP 0649605 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94116041 A

Priority

DE 4336453 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0649605A2] The invention relates to the separation of tobacco fibres within the distributor of a cigarette-strand machine. The object is to carry out the separation effectively and in a way which treats the tobacco carefully. This is achieved within a falling shaft (8) of the distributor, into which the tobacco (7) is transferred in a manner accelerated downwards in a main flightpath (41). Provided in the falling shaft (8) limited by mutually opposite channel walls (42, 43) are alternately offset air slits (44, 46), through which blowing air is directed essentially transversely to the flightpath (41) towards the tobacco flying downwards, with the result that the latter is alternately deflected laterally out of its flightpath. The lateral deflection is advantageously associated with a loosening and separation of the tobacco fibres which have an advantageous effect on the quality of the finished cigarettes. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24C 5/39

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/39 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24C 5/39 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0649605 A2 19950426; EP 0649605 A3 19980819; EP 0649605 B1 20000315; AT 190471 T 20000415; DE 4336453 A1 19950427; ES 2144477 T3 20000616

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20041013

2005-10-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051012

2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050501

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-06-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041012

2005-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2005-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050501

2004-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041013

2004-10-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041012

2003-11-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031104

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-10-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20031027

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-10-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20031024

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-10-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031022

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-09-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030925

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-08-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030814

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-10-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021012

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-18 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20011018

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HAUNI MASCHINENBAU A.G.

- Effective date: 20001031

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144477 T3

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409204 20000420

2000-04-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190471 T 20000415

2000-02-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1999-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990505

1999-04-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990210

1998-08-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1995-11-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HAUNI MASCHINENBAU AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1995-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE