Global Patent Index - EP 0649896 B1

EP 0649896 B1 2000-05-03 - Process for the simultaneous production of middle distillates and lubrification oils from heavy petroleum fractions

Title (en)

Process for the simultaneous production of middle distillates and lubrification oils from heavy petroleum fractions

Title (de)

Verfahren zur gleichzeitigen Produktion von Mitteldestillaten und Schmierölen aus Schwerölfraktionen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la production conjointe de distillats moyens et d'huiles lubrifiantes à partir de coupes pétrolières lourdes

Publication

EP 0649896 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 94402284 A

Priority

FR 9312856 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0649896A1] Process for joint production of middle distillates and of oil bases (viscosity index between 95 and 150) especially from vacuum distillates and/or deasphalted oils. The process includes a first stage in which the feedstock is brought into contact with an amorphous catalyst filled with at least one metal or metal compound which has a hydrodehydrogenating function, such as Ni, Mo, W or Co, at a temperature of between 350 and 430 DEG C, a pressure of between 5 and 20 MPa, a space velocity of between 0.1 and 5 h<-1> and in the presence of hydrogen in an H2/HC volume ratio = 150 to 2,000, the product originating from the first stage is brought into contact (in a second stage), with a second catalyst including a support, a zeolite Y, at least one element of group VIB and at least one metal of group VIII at a temperature of between 350 and 430 DEG C, a pressure of between 5 and 20 MPa and a space velocity of between 0.1 and 5 h<-1>.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10G 65/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 23/85 (2006.01); B01J 29/16 (2006.01); C10G 45/08 (2006.01); C10G 45/50 (2006.01); C10G 47/20 (2006.01); C10G 49/04 (2006.01); C10G 49/08 (2006.01); C10G 65/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 65/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0649896 A1 19950426; EP 0649896 B1 20000503; CA 2134281 A1 19950426; CA 2134281 C 20050802; DE 69424247 D1 20000608; DE 69424247 T2 20000907; ES 2148297 T3 20001016; FR 2711667 A1 19950505; FR 2711667 B1 19960202; JP 3564581 B2 20040915; JP H07179864 A 19950718; RU 2135549 C1 19990827; RU 94037956 A 19960910; US 5525209 A 19960611

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-03-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20050929

2006-01-18 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20050929

2006-01-18 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20050929

2005-10-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051025

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-10-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20051025

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-10-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20051024

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-09-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050923

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-09-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050915

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-10-09 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20031009

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V.

2001-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.

2001-03-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V.

- Effective date: 20010131

2001-03-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.

- Effective date: 20010205

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148297 T3

2000-06-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000525

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69424247 20000608

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-02-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1997-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970623

1995-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951026

1995-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL