Global patent index - EP 0649913 B1

EP 0649913 B1 2000-01-26 - High strength stainless austenitic steel with high structural stability and its uses

Title (en)

High strength stainless austenitic steel with high structural stability and its uses

Title (de)

Hochfester rostfreier austenitischer Stahl mit hoher Gefügebeständigkeit und seine Verwendungen

Title (fr)

Acier inoxydable austénitique à hautes caractéristiques ayant une grande stabilité structurale et utilisations

Publication

EP 0649913 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 94402202 A

Priority

FR 9312578 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0649913A1] The steel contains, by weight, from 0.35 to 0.8 % of nitrogen and from 1 to 5 % of tungsten. The chemical composition of the steel preferably comprises, in weight contents, 23 to 28 % of Cr, 15 to 28 % of Ni, 0.5 to 6 % of Mn, from 3 to 8 % of Mo, in addition to the nitrogen and tungsten. As a result of its high corrosion resistance the steel can be employed for the manufacture of massive components for any application, especially for the manufacture of equipment for oil platforms and for chemical factories, of containers for the transport of corrosive products, of ships' hulls and of plated sheets.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 30/00; C22C 38/00; C22C 38/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 30/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 30/00 (2013.01); C22C 38/001 (2013.01); C22C 38/58 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0649913 A1 19950426; EP 0649913 B1 20000126; AT 189268 T 20000215; CA 2118288 A1 19950422; CA 2118288 C 20041005; DE 69422772 D1 20000302; DE 69422772 T2 20000608; DK 0649913 T3 20000619; ES 2141808 T3 20000401; FI 109032 B 20020515; FI 944908 A0 19941019; FI 944908 A 19950422; FR 2711674 A1 19950505; FR 2711674 B1 19960112; GR 3033188 T3 20000831; NO 302710 B1 19980414; NO 943942 A 19950424; NO 943942 D0 19941018; PT 649913 E 20000630; US 5494636 A 19960227

INPADOC legal status

2015-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20141004

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20141002

2015-01-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20150107

2014-12-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2014-11-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK07

- Ref Document Number: 189268

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20141003

2014-10-22 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20141002

2014-10-15 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: V4

- Effective date: 20141003

2014-10-07 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69422772

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-10-06 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUP

- Effective date: 20141003

2014-10-03 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69422772

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20131018

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131014

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20131030

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131004

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131017

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131010

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20131015

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130925

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-10-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081003

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-07-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2009-05-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2007-11-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070917

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-09-27 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20070927

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-11-10 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2006-11-10 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2006-11-10 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CJ

2006-11-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2004-07-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES;SEARCHED & EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-05-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-04-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2003-10-03 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031003

2002-10-09 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20021009

- Year of fee payment: 09

2002-09-27 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20020927

- Year of fee payment: 09

2002-09-17 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20020917

- Year of fee payment: 09

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-30 [REG PT PD4A] CHANGE OF PROPRIETORSHIP

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PD4A

- Free Format Text: USINOR INDUSTEEL (FRANCE) FR

- Effective date: 20010904

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000320

2000-06-19 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000327

2000-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2141808

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-03-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: FRENCH

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69422772

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000302

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 189268

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20000215

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1999-11-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

1997-10-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970908

1995-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950114

1995-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE