Global Patent Index - EP 0649946 B1

EP 0649946 B1 2001-05-02 - Process for actuating a shut-off valve and a control system for actuating such a valve

Title (en)

Process for actuating a shut-off valve and a control system for actuating such a valve

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betätigen eines Absperrventils sowie Steueranordnung zum Betätigen eines solchen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de commande d'une soupape d'obturation

Publication

EP 0649946 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94116591 A

Priority

DE 4336020 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0649946A2] The invention relates to a control system (10) for a subatmospheric-pressure-actuable shut-off valve, intended for a subatmospheric-pressure waste-water (sewage) system, comprising a first valve (14) which can be actuated by a dynamic pressure caused by accumulated wastewater, and a chamber (56) which can be pressure-adjusted via the first valve and in which, or adjacent to which, there is adjustably arranged a valve piston (24), acted upon by a spring (71), of a second valve (20) via which, in dependence on the pressure prevailing in the chamber, a subatmospheric pressure passes to the shut-off valve in order to open the same, wherein, in the absence of dynamic pressure, the first valve closes and a pressure change which is necessary for closing the second valve takes place in the chamber. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16K 31/122 (2006.01); E03F 1/00 (2006.01); F16K 17/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03F 1/006 (2013.01); Y10S 137/907 (2013.01); Y10T 137/0379 (2015.04); Y10T 137/7316 (2015.04); Y10T 137/7768 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0649946 A2 19950426; EP 0649946 A3 19960731; EP 0649946 B1 20010502; DE 4336020 A1 19950427; DE 4336020 C2 19970515; JP H07198052 A 19950801; US 5657784 A 19970819

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131022

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-08-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-07 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59409737

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-08-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140630

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131021

2014-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131021

2014-06-03 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-05-21 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140501

2013-03-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20121018

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121024

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20121024

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121023

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121113

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-04-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010723

2001-06-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409737 20010607

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL SE

2000-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROEDIGER VAKUUM- UND HAUSTECHNIK GMBH

1999-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990707

1996-10-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960809

1996-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL SE

1996-07-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: SI

1995-10-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL SE

1995-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL SE

1995-04-26 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: SI