Global Patent Index - EP 0650084 B1

EP 0650084 B1 2000-05-17 - Silver halide photographic emulsion comprising grains having faces (100) with cavities

Title (en)

Silver halide photographic emulsion comprising grains having faces (100) with cavities

Title (de)

Photographische Silberhalogenidemulsion, die Körner enthält, welche (100)-Flächen mit Aushöhlungen aufweisen

Title (fr)

Emulsion d'halogénure d'argent photographique comprenant des grains à faces (100) avec des cavités

Publication

EP 0650084 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94420275 A

Priority

FR 9312713 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0650084A1] The present invention concerns a silver halide photographic emulsion. This emulsion comprises grains with faces (100) in which cavities are formed. Application to the improvement of the sensitivity of the photographic emulsion. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/035

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/015 (2006.01); G03C 1/035 (2006.01); G03C 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/015 (2013.01); G03C 1/035 (2013.01); G03C 1/18 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. G03C 1/015 + G03C 2001/0156 + G03C 2200/44
  2. G03C 1/035 + G03C 2001/03535

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0650084 A1 19950426; EP 0650084 B1 20000517; DE 69424498 D1 20000621; DE 69424498 T2 20010118; FR 2711431 A1 19950428; FR 2711431 B1 19960105

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-06-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020628

2002-06-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011017

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011017

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20001030

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-10-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20001009

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-09-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20000918

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-09-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69424498 20000621

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990125

1995-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951010

1995-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB