Global Patent Index - EP 0650399 B1

EP 0650399 B1 2001-01-10 - SORTING INSTALLATION

Title (en)

SORTING INSTALLATION

Title (de)

SORTIERANLAGE

Title (fr)

INSTALLATION DE TRIAGE

Publication

EP 0650399 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94915031 A

Priority

  • DE 9400558 W
  • DE 4315691 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4416457A1] The invention proposes a sorting installation which is intended for useful materials and serves, in particular, for separating out re-usable packaging materials. In order to achieve extremely effective separating-out of individual types of packaging, the separating out of individual monofractions onto a parallel collecting conveyor belt is carried out on one or more hand-sorting sections, the contents of which collecting conveyor belt are introduced, after separating out has taken place, into an associated bunker. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07B 13/00; B03B 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07C 7/04 (2006.01); B03B 9/06 (2006.01); B07B 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B03B 9/061 (2013.01); B03B 9/06 (2013.01); B07B 13/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 4416457 A1 19941117; DE 4416457 C2 19970522; AT 198559 T 20010115; CA 2138548 A1 19941124; EP 0650399 A1 19950503; EP 0650399 B1 20010110; JP H07508931 A 19951005; WO 9426429 A1 19941124

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030531

2005-03-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2003-07-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030728

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-05-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020523

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-11 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-05-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010510

2001-04-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409632 20010215

2001-01-31 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BEZNER MASCHINEN GMBH

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2001-01-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-01-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-01-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198559 T 20010115

1997-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970417

1995-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950110

1995-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT