Global patent index - EP 0650769 B1

EP 0650769 B1 2000-01-05 - Slot coating die configuration

Title (en)

Slot coating die configuration

Title (de)

Konfiguration einer Schlitzauftragsdüse

Title (fr)

Configuration de filière d'enduction en forme de fente

Publication

EP 0650769 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94115809 A

Priority

US 14596093 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0650769A1] A new and useful configuration for a slot coating die is provided, which is designed to apply a substantially streakless coating of a hot melt material (e.g., hot melt varnish) to a moving substrate such as a web of printed label stock. The coating die is specially configured to (i) provide a substantially smooth, streakless coating of a hot melt material onto a moving substrate, and (ii) allow small particles in the hot melt material to be released from the coating die and the web so that the particles should not accumulate in the coating die or cause streaking of the coating. The coating die has an upper lip (36), a lower lip (38), and a slot (34) disposed between the upper and lower lips. The upper lip (36) is undercut (or offset) relative to the lower lip (38) , and has a front face which is configured to form (i) a wiping surface (60), (ii) a release surface (62) which extends beyond the wiping surface (60) and curves away from the moving substrate, and (iii) a relief surface (64) which extends from the slot (34) to the wiping surface. During operation of the slot coating die, hot melt material is extruded through the slot(34) , and the configuration of the upper die member (i) guides the hot melt material in the direction of movement of the substrate and toward the wiping surface, (ii) gently wipes the hot melt material to a smooth, streakless state, and (iii) enables small particles in the hot melt material to be released from the slot coating die in a manner designed to avoid accumulation of particles in the coating die and/or streaking of the coating. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05C 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 5/0254 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0650769 A1 19950503; EP 0650769 B1 20000105; AU 674785 B2 19970109; AU 7589794 A 19950518; CA 2133266 A1 19950430; DE 69422473 D1 20000210; DE 69422473 T2 20000727; JP H07185435 A 19950725

INPADOC legal status

2006-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20051007

2006-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060503

2005-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051007

2005-10-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051007

2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2004-11-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041124

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-10-20 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041020

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-10-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041020

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-11-03 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031103

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-04-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. DINI ROBERTO

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2000-02-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69422473

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-10

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1996-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19960621

1996-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19951026

1995-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI