Global Patent Index - EP 0650782 B1

EP 0650782 B1 2000-12-13 - Press brake

Title (en)

Press brake

Title (de)

Abkantpresse

Title (fr)

Presse plieuse

Publication

EP 0650782 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94115354 A

Priority

DE 9315209 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0650782A1] In a press brake (20) for bending workpieces (22) along a bending line (23), with an operating area (17) in front of the bending line (23), with a stop area (24) behind the bending line (23), with a drive (21) for the stroke of a bending tool (9), with a stroke-actuating device (7) which activates the drive (21) and with an interlock device to prevent the stroke-actuating device (7) from being switched on, with a stop device (26) which is arranged in the stop area (24) and has a rail (27) which can be moved and positioned perpendicular to the bending line (23) by means of a controllable drive and on which at least two stop fingers (28, 29) which can be displaced and positioned along the rail (27) by hand and fixed by means of a clamping device (42) are arranged, the position of the individual stop fingers can be changed manually without danger by virtue of the fact that a locking device is provided for the release of the clamping device (42) and in that the stop device (26) can be moved into a position in which the stop fingers (28, 29) project beyond the bending line (23) into the operating area (17) of the press brake, the switch-on interlock device is operative and the locking device for the release of the clamping device (42) is inoperative. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 43/26; B21D 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 5/00 (2006.01); B21D 43/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 5/002 (2013.01); B21D 43/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 9315209 U1 19950216; AT 198058 T 20001215; EP 0650782 A1 19950503; EP 0650782 B1 20001213; JP 3012184 U 19950613; US 5501095 A 19960326

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 198058 T

- Effective date: 20140929

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140930

2014-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-09-30 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59409607

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130918

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130923

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090929

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090929

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090929

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080915

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080924

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409607 20010118

2001-01-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-12-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUZZI, NOTARO&ANTONIELLI D'OULX

2000-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198058 T 20001215

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990316

1995-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951028

1995-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI