Global Patent Index - EP 0650915 B1

EP 0650915 B1 2001-01-10 - Device for testing the quality of the winding of yarn bobbins and use of the device in a winding and spinning machine

Title (en)

Device for testing the quality of the winding of yarn bobbins and use of the device in a winding and spinning machine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Überprüfung der Wickelqualität von Garnspulen und Verwendung der Vorrichtung an einer Spul- oder Spinnmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour contrôler la qualité de l'enroulement de bobines de fil et utilisation du dispositif dans un bobinoir ou un métier à filer

Publication

EP 0650915 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94116148 A

Priority

CH 326293 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0650915A1] The device contains a number of sensors (15) which are arranged decentrally on a spinning or winding machine and which are provided for the on-line monitoring of the winding quality during the production of the bobbins (4). Each sensor (15) contains a light source, illuminating and imaging optics and a detector. The sensors (15) are preferably mounted on the bobbin changers (5). Use on spinning or winding machines equipped with an electronic yarn-cleaning system (12, 13, 14), with an interlinking of the measurement signals. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 63/00; B65H 63/032

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 63/00 (2006.01); B65H 63/032 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 63/006 (2013.01); B65H 63/0324 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0650915 A1 19950503; EP 0650915 B1 20010110; AT 198587 T 20010115; CH 686779 A5 19960628; CN 1079776 C 20020227; CN 1106536 A 19950809; DE 59409633 D1 20010215; JP H07172699 A 19950711; US 5636803 A 19970610

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081013

2009-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *USTER TECHNOLOGIES A.G.

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071220

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071026

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071011

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-10-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011013

2001-06-08 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-02-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FIAMMENGHI - DOMENIGHETTI

2001-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409633 20010215

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE IT

2001-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198587 T 20010115

2000-09-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ASCHMANN, ALFRED

2000-09-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HENSEL, ROLF

2000-09-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WAMPFLER, HANS, DR.

1996-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19951211

1995-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951030

1995-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE IT