Global Patent Index - EP 0651058 B1

EP 0651058 B1 2000-08-23 - Process for introducing a second flow of powdered materials into a pneumatic transport system conveying powdered materials with adjustable flow rate

Title (en)

Process for introducing a second flow of powdered materials into a pneumatic transport system conveying powdered materials with adjustable flow rate

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Einleiten eines zweiten Stromes pulverförmiger Materialien in ein pneumatisches, pulverförmige Materialienführendes, Fördersystem mit einstellbarer Durchflussregelung

Title (fr)

Procédé d'introduction d'un deuxième flux de matériaux pulvérulents dans une conduite de transport pneumatique véhiculant un premier débit réglable de matériaux pulvérulents

Publication

EP 0651058 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 94114430 A

Priority

LU 88422 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0651058A1] The second flow of pulverulent materials is introduced at a controlled flow rate and the control of the first flow rate is rendered insensitive to the perturbations generated by the introduction of the second flow by controlling the first flow rate directly or indirectly upstream of the point of injection of the second flow. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21B 5/00; B01F 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65G 53/66 (2006.01); B01F 3/18 (2006.01); B01F 5/04 (2006.01); B01F 13/02 (2006.01); B01F 15/00 (2006.01); C21B 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21B 5/003 (2013.01); B01F 3/188 (2013.01); B01F 5/045 (2013.01); B01F 13/0227 (2013.01); B01F 15/00123 (2013.01); B01F 15/00162 (2013.01); B01F 15/00292 (2013.01); B01F 15/00344 (2013.01); Y10S 75/961 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0211295 A1 19870225 - WURTH PAUL SA [LU]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0651058 A1 19950503; EP 0651058 B1 20000823; BR 9404543 A 19950704; CA 2118262 A1 19950504; CA 2118262 C 20051122; DE 69425627 D1 20000928; DE 69425627 T2 20010419; LU 88422 A1 19950710; RU 2150422 C1 20000610; RU 94040172 A 19960920; US 5516356 A 19960514

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140913

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140916

2014-10-08 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20140913

2014-09-16 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69425627

2014-09-14 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69425627

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130814

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130814

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120930

2013-06-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIDMAR N.V.

- Effective date: 20120930

2013-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. PAUL *WURTH

- Effective date: 20120930

2011-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110812

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110824

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69425627 20000928

2000-09-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000825

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

1998-06-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980505

1995-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950908

1995-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB