Global patent index - EP 0651084 B1

EP 0651084 B1 2000-05-31 - Automatic device for loading and unloading stacks of reels of yarn

Title (en)

Automatic device for loading and unloading stacks of reels of yarn

Title (de)

Automatische Einrichtung zum Auf- und Abladen von Garnspulenstapeln

Title (fr)

Installation automatique pour le chargement et le déchargement de piles de bobines de fil

Publication

EP 0651084 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94202678 A

Priority

IT MI932045 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0651084A2] An automatic device for loading and unloading stacks of reels of yarn comprises a centering mechanism (8, 10-13, 17, 18, 20, 21, 100) of a vertical reel-holding rod (3) on which the reels (4) are, or are about to be, stacked; the centering mechanism (8, 10-13, 17, 18, 20, 21, 100) comprises a vertical stem (13) on which a stack of reels to be moved is transferred so as to move it from a rod (3) to be unloaded to a rod (3) to be loaded, and a mechanism (24-29, 32, 35, 40) for removing and positioning the stack of reels that comprises an element (24) for removing the stack of reels (4) that is made to slide vertically to accomplish the removal or the positioning of the stack itself; the centering mechanism (8, 10-13, 17, 18, 20, 21, 100) comprises sensor means (18, 20, 21, 100) suitable for detecting the vertical alignment of the stem (13) with the reel-holding rod (3) and to operate the activation of the removal and positioning mechanism (24-29, 32, 35, 40); the removal element of the removal and positioning mechanism (24-29, 32, 35, 40) is constituted by a pair of jaws (24) suitable for grasping a reel (4) at the base of the stack. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06B 23/04; D06B 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06B 5/16 (2006.01); D06B 23/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06B 23/04 (2013.01); D06B 5/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0651084 A2 19950503; EP 0651084 A3 19970312; EP 0651084 B1 20000531; AT 193567 T 20000615; DE 69424742 D1 20000706; DE 69424742 T2 20001116; ES 2147768 T3 20001001; IT 1272675 B 19970626; IT MI932045 A1 19950324; IT MI932045 D0 19930924; PT 651084 E 20000929

INPADOC legal status

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130930

- Year of fee payment: 20

2006-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2005-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20040917

2005-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-05-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20050316

2005-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-03-16 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050316

2004-10-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041004

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-09-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040917

2003-10-07 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031007

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-09-26 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030926

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-09-26 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030926

- Year of fee payment: 10

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2000-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2147768

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-09-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000626

2000-09-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MITTLER & C. S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69424742

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-06

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI PT

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 193567

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-01-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981207

1997-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970423

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI PT

1995-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI PT