Global patent index - EP 0651361 B1

EP 0651361 B1 2000-04-26 - Alarm system with a radio link between the peripheral stations and a central unit

Title (en)

Alarm system with a radio link between the peripheral stations and a central unit

Title (de)

Funkalarmanlage mit einer Funkstrecke zwischen den Aussenstationen und der Zentraleinheit einer Alarmanlage

Title (fr)

Système d'alarme avec une liaison radio entre les stations périphériques et l'unité centrale

Publication

EP 0651361 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94116871 A

Priority

DE 4337211 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4337211C1] The invention relates to a radio alarm system with a radio link between the remote stations (peripheral stations) and the central unit of the alarm system, the radio signals containing data messages which represent one event each and the central unit being tuned to the radio signals of the remote stations associated with the alarm system. The object of the invention is to improve a radio alarm system of this type in such a way that disturbances in the radio transmission can be reduced with reasonable outlay. According to the invention, this is achieved in that the transmission frequency of the remote stations is changed in each case after the transmission of one or more blocks of information, each block of information being transmitted a plurality of times. The available transmission spectrum is scanned in the central unit and it is evaluated whether all reported sensors have transmitted a message during a predetermined time interval. In the central unit, it is furthermore checked whether or not the error rate of the transmitted messages exceeds a predetermined value. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 25/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 25/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 25/003 (2013.01); G08B 25/007 (2013.01); G08B 25/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 4337211 C1 19941215; EP 0651361 A1 19950503; EP 0651361 B1 20000426

INPADOC legal status

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20141025

2014-11-19 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20141025

2014-10-28 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59409303

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131028

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131105

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131029

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-03-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2005-03-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2002-08-02 [REG FR D6] PATENT ENDORSED LICENCES OF RIGHTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: D6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GRUNDIG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2000-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59409303

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-31

2000-05-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-04-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

1998-04-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980225

1997-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GRUNDIG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1995-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19951102

1995-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT