Global Patent Index - EP 0651988 B1

EP 0651988 B1 2001-03-21 - Localized hydromassaging device

Title (en)

Localized hydromassaging device

Title (de)

Gerät zur lokale Hydromassage

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'hydromassage localisé

Publication

EP 0651988 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94203143 A

Priority

IT MI932340 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0651988A1] A device (10, 110) for localized hydromassage of the body comprising a head which emits a stream of water in correspondence with one of its faces (14, 114) designed to be disposed facing the body of the user. The head contains transducer elements (15, 115, 215, 315) which introduce ultrasonic waves into said stream of water so as to produce an ultrasonic micromassaging action in the area of the body subjected to the stream of water. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61H 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61H 23/02 (2006.01); A61H 33/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61H 23/0245 (2013.01); A61H 33/6089 (2013.01); A61H 33/027 (2013.01); A61H 33/6052 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0651988 A1 19950510; EP 0651988 B1 20010321; AT 199825 T 20010415; DE 69426912 D1 20010426; DE 69426912 T2 20010816; ES 2155080 T3 20010501; IT 1266669 B1 19970109; IT MI932340 A1 19950504; IT MI932340 D0 19931104

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081029

2009-12-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20081029

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081028

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081028

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081028

2009-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-07-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081028

2009-05-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TEUCO GUZZINI S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071228

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071016

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071017

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071024

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071016

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20071024

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-02-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20071030

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071030

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20071015

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20071029

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155080 T3

2001-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69426912 20010426

2001-04-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2001-03-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2001-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199825 T 20010415

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981104

1999-12-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TEUCO GUZZINI S.P.A.

1999-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TEUCO GUZZINI S.P.A.

1998-12-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981104

1995-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950927

1995-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL