Global Patent Index - EP 0652689 B1

EP 0652689 B1 2000-01-19 - Modular lamp power supply system

Title (en)

Modular lamp power supply system

Title (de)

Modularische Einrichtung zum Betreiben einer Beleuchtungsanlage

Title (fr)

Système modulaire d'alimentation d'un dispositif d'éclairage

Publication

EP 0652689 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94308163 A

Priority

US 14728493 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0652689A2] A modular lamp power supply is adapted to provide lamp power supply signals to a plurality of different lamps, each lamp having different power requirements. The power supply can be reconfigured to supply power to a new group of lamps simply by replacing the power circuit modules within the supply chassis. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 37/02; H05B 39/00; H05B 41/00; H05B 41/02; H05B 41/36; H05K 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/24 (2006.01); H05B 37/02 (2006.01); H05B 41/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 37/02 (2013.01); H05B 41/00 (2013.01); Y10T 307/25 (2015.04); Y10T 307/406 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0652689 A2 19950510; EP 0652689 A3 19960327; EP 0652689 B1 20000119; AU 693477 B2 19980702; AU 7766794 A 19950518; CA 2134848 A1 19950506; CA 2134848 C 19981124; DE 69422686 D1 20000224; JP H07241085 A 19950912; TW 387650 U 20000411; US 5640061 A 19970617

INPADOC legal status


2001-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20001104

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001104

2000-06-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-04-20 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000420

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69422686

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-24

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

2000-01-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000119

1998-11-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980925

1996-04-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960213

1996-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE

1995-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB SE