Global Patent Index - EP 0652992 B2

EP 0652992 B2 2000-11-02 - PRESS OF PAPER MACHINE FOR THIN PAPERS

Title (en)

PRESS OF PAPER MACHINE FOR THIN PAPERS

Title (de)

PRESSE EINER PAPIERMASCHINE FÜR DÜNNE PAPIERE

Title (fr)

PRESSE DE MACHINE A FABRIQUER DU PAPIER POUR PAPIERS FINS

Publication

EP 0652992 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 94917672 A

Priority

  • DE 4318036 A
  • DE 4321402 A
  • EP 9401730 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5670023A] PCT No. PCT/EP94/01730 Sec. 371 Date Jan. 30, 1995 Sec. 102(e) Date Jan. 30, 1995 PCT Filed May 27, 1994 PCT Pub. No. WO94/28240 PCT Pub. Date Dec. 8, 1994The press section of a paper machine for thin papers has the following characteristics: a pressing gap is formed by a rotary, smooth surface (1) in contact with the paper and by a felted pressing roll (3); the smooth surface (1) transfers the paper web downstream of the pressing gap to a heatable roll (4) without free pulling of the paper web. The invention is characterized in that the smooth surface (1) is the outer surface of a tubular roll with dimensionally stiff roll sleeve.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/02 (2006.01); D21F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/045 (2013.01); D21F 3/0281 (2013.01); D21F 3/04 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5670023 A 19970923; AT 156208 T 19970815; BR 9405408 A 19990908; CA 2141292 A1 19941208; EP 0652992 A1 19950517; EP 0652992 B1 19970730; EP 0652992 B2 20001102; ES 2105720 T3 19971016; FI 950376 A0 19950127; FI 950376 A 19950127; JP H08502104 A 19960305; WO 9428240 A1 19941208

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050527

2004-01-07 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-05-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030528

2003-05-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030527

2002-12-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021203

2002-05-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020524

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-05-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020522

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-05-13 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020513

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-06-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010613

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-05-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010518

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-05-02 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 19970730

2001-03-30 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-02-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010213

2000-11-02 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-04-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20000427

- Year of fee payment: 7

1998-05-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: VALMET-KARLSTAD AB

- Effective date: 19980311

1997-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2105720 T3

1997-10-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

1997-09-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1997-09-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19970814

1997-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59403546 19970904

1997-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

1997-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19970730

1997-07-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19970730

1997-07-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 156208 T 19970815

1996-02-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19951222

1995-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19941224

1995-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE