Global patent index - EP 0653253 B1

EP 0653253 B1 2001-02-28 - Method for rolling finished sections from section blanks by means of a reversibly driven arrangement of roll stands

Title (en)

Method for rolling finished sections from section blanks by means of a reversibly driven arrangement of roll stands

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Walzen von Fertigprofilen aus einem Vorprofil mittels einer im Reversierbetrieb arbeitenden Walzgerüst-Anordnung

Title (fr)

Procédé pour laminer des profilés finis à partir d'ébanches par un arrangement de cages de laminoir à entraînement reversible

Publication

EP 0653253 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94116696 A

Priority

DE 4337555 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0653253A1] A method for rolling finished sections from a preliminary section (section blank) by means of an arrangement of roll stands which comprises a first universal stand on the entry side, a second universal stand on the exit side and an edger arranged between these universal stands. An edger is arranged ahead of the rolling group. The preliminary section comes from a continuous casting device and has, at both ends of a web, thickened portions corresponding to the subsequent finished profile. The dimensions of the preliminary section are matched in such a way to the web height, web thickness and/or flange width of the finished section to be rolled that this preliminary section is introduced directly into the first universal stand and can then be rolled to give the finished section with the specified dimensions or, to obtain different dimensions deviating from the original specification, the web-like portion and/or the flange-like thickened portions of the preliminary section are, before the preliminary section is introduced into the first universal roll stand, subjected to reduction rolling in a rolling line (W1) with a free outlet extending parallel to the rolling line (W2) of the arrangement of roll stands (U1, SG, U2), and the preliminary section is then displaced transversely into a position directly in front of the compact rolling group (U1, SG, U2) and introduced into the latter. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 1/14; B21B 1/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/00 (2006.01); B21B 1/08 (2006.01); B21B 1/088 (2006.01); B21B 1/14 (2006.01); B21B 1/46 (2006.01); B21B 13/16 (2006.01); B21B 39/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/14 (2013.01); B21B 1/466 (2013.01); B21B 1/088 (2013.01); B21B 39/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4337555 A1 19950511; AT 199331 T 20010315; CN 1054785 C 20000726; CN 1106320 A 19950809; EP 0653253 A1 19950517; EP 0653253 B1 20010228; ES 2155077 T3 20010501; JP H07195101 A 19950801; RU 2126302 C1 19990220; RU 94040144 A 19960910; TW 288998 B 19961021

INPADOC legal status

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20141021

2015-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20141023

2015-01-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20150108

2014-12-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK07

- Ref Document Number: 199331

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20141022

2014-11-12 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20141021

2014-10-23 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59409664

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-10-22 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59409664

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131029

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131028

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131021

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131011

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131024

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131021

- Year of fee payment: 20

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SMS DEMAG A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20051031

2006-10-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051023

2004-11-17 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041117

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-10-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041012

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-10-12 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041012

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-06-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010529

2001-05-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2155077

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59409664

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-05

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU SE

2001-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 199331

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-03-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1997-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970207

1995-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19941110

1995-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT LU SE