Global patent index - EP 0653480 B1

EP 0653480 B1 2000-01-19 - Softening through the wash compositions

Title (en)

Softening through the wash compositions

Title (de)

Beim Waschen weichmachende Zusammensetzungen

Title (fr)

Compositions adoucissants pour le lavage simultané

Publication

EP 0653480 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93309041 A

Priority

EP 93309041 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0653480A1] A detergent composition comprising a crystalline layered silicate having the formula NaMSixO2x+1 yH2O wherein M is sodium or hydrogen, x is a number from 1.9 to 4 and y is a number from 0 to 20. and a flocculating polymer selected from polymers and copolymers derived from monomers as ethylene oxide, acrylamide, acrylic acid, dimethylamino ethyl methacrylate, vinyl alcohol, vinyl pyrrolidone, ethylene imine or mixtures thereof characterized in that said detergent composition comprises less than 5% of clay by weight of the detergent composition.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/12; C11D 3/37

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/386 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/065 (2013.01); C11D 3/0021 (2013.01); C11D 3/3776 (2013.01); C11D 3/3792 (2013.01); C11D 3/38609 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0653480 A1 19950517; EP 0653480 B1 20000119; AT 188989 T 20000215; AU 7974394 A 19950529; DE 69327654 D1 20000224; DE 69327654 T2 20000831; DK 0653480 T3 20000417; ES 2141138 T3 20000316; GR 3033126 T3 20000831; PT 653480 E 20000731; WO 9513348 A1 19950518

INPADOC legal status

2003-12-31 [REG PT MF4A] REVOCATION OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MF4A

- Effective date: 20031103

2003-11-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20030226

2003-10-28 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ECNC

2003-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-09-17 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20030226

2003-09-17 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free Format Text: 20030226

2002-12-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20021223

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-12-13 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20021213

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-11-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021127

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-11-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20021118

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-11-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20021106

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-11-05 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021105

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-10-24 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20021024

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-10-23 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20021023

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-10-11 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20021011

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-10-03 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20021003

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-10-02 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20021002

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-10-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021002

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-09-27 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20020927

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-09-16 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20020916

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

2000-12-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-04-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-03-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

2000-03-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2000-03-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69327654

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000224

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & SEIFERT

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 188989

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20000215

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1998-03-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980126

1995-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951021

1995-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE