Global patent index - EP 0653513 B1

EP 0653513 B1 2000-01-19 - Process for drying a paper web and dryer section of a papermachine

Title (en)

Process for drying a paper web and dryer section of a papermachine

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Trocknen einer Papierbahn sowie Trockenpartie einer Papiermaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé pour le séchage d'une bande de papier et section de séchage d'une machine à papier

Publication

EP 0653513 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94116045 A

Priority

US 15044993 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2135502A1] PROCEDURE FOR DRYING A PAPER WEB AND A DRYING PART FOR A PAPER MACHINE A process for drying a paper web and a drying section of a paper making machine. The drying section includes at least one drying group comprised of a plurality of drying cylinders, each at least partially wrapped by a web to be dried. The drying cylinders having peripheral surfaces heated for drying the web moving therepast. The peripheral surfaces of the drying cylinders in the drying groups are rotated at the velocity of the web along the web path. At least one of the drying cylinders in at least one drying group is driven to rotate at a speed that is different than the speed of the web moving past the at least one cylinder. The at least one cylinder may be selectively driven to rotate faster or slower than the speed of the web moving therepast, which applies more heat to the paper web. The invention is adaptable for a single tier drying section and/or for a double tier drying sections or for other drying section arrangements. The operation of a drying cylinder at a different speed than the other cylinders is useful for one or more than one drying cylinder in a drying group and where a drying section is comprised of more than one drying group, is useful for a drying cylinder in one or more of the drying groups.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 5/04; D21F 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/04 (2006.01); D21F 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/042 (2013.01); D21F 7/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4404717 A1 19940721; DE 4404717 C2 19941124; AT 189015 T 20000215; CA 2135502 A1 19950511; EP 0653513 A2 19950517; EP 0653513 A3 19960131; EP 0653513 B1 20000119; FI 945280 A0 19941109; FI 945280 A 19950511; JP H07189161 A 19950725; US 5467534 A 19951121

INPADOC legal status

2005-10-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051012

2002-06-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011012

2002-06-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Document Number: 94116045.9

- Format of ref. document F/P: F

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011013

2001-10-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011012

2001-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-23 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20001023

- Year of fee payment: 07

2000-10-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-09-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20000925

- Year of fee payment: 07

2000-06-16 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-03-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000208

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR GB IT LI SE

2000-01-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 189015

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20000215

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

1999-12-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1999-09-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: J.M. VOITH GMBH & CO. BETEILIGUNGEN KG

1999-01-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981201

1996-07-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960531

1996-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR GB IT LI SE

1995-06-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SALTER, ROBERT L.

1995-06-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SOLLINGER, HANS-PETER, DR.

1995-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR GB IT LI SE