Global Patent Index - EP 0654316 B1

EP 0654316 B1 2000-05-03 - Clamping device for a cutting insert

Title (en)

Clamping device for a cutting insert

Title (de)

Spannvorrichtung für einen Schneideinsatz

Title (fr)

Dispositif de serrage pour une plaquette de coupe

Publication

EP 0654316 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94118012 A

Priority

IL 10767593 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0654316A1] A metal cutting tool assembly comprising a rigid holder blade (1), an insert receiving slot (9) formed in a leading end of the holder blade and defined between a resiliently displaceable clamping jaw (3) formed integrally with the holder blade (1) and rigid base jaw (4) forming part of the holder blade, spaced apart displacement and supporting surfaces respectively formed in or on the clamping jaw (3) and the holder, and a slot opening key (21,33,41) a pair of spaced apart projecting prongs (24a,24b/34a,34b/42a,42b) of the key adapted to engage the surfaces. At least one of the prongs is displaceable with respect to the holder blade so as resiliently to displace the clamping jaw (3) outwardly with respect to the base jaw into an opening position for insertion or removal of an insert (7). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23B 27/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23B 27/04 (2006.01); B23B 27/16 (2006.01); B23D 61/04 (2006.01); F16B 2/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B23B 27/04 (2013.01); B23B 2205/02 (2013.01); B23B 2260/0785 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49822 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49945 (2013.01); Y10T 82/2589 (2013.01); Y10T 407/194 (2013.01); Y10T 407/2286 (2013.01); Y10T 407/2288 (2013.01); Y10T 407/25 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0654316 A1 19950524; EP 0654316 B1 20000503; EP 0654316 B2 20051026; AT 192372 T 20000515; AU 671046 B2 19960808; AU 683809 B2 19971120; AU 7060596 A 19970116; AU 7779594 A 19950525; BR 9404486 A 19950711; CA 2136139 A1 19950520; CA 2136139 C 20050510; CN 1047969 C 20000105; CN 1107767 A 19950906; CZ 285619 B6 19991013; CZ 9402848 A3 19950712; DE 69424258 D1 20000608; DE 69424258 T2 20000928; DE 69424258 T3 20060518; DE 9422354 U1 20001005; ES 2145802 T3 20000716; ES 2145802 T5 20060301; HU 215105 B 19980928; HU 9403285 D0 19950130; HU T70649 A 19951030; IL 107675 A 19970110; IL 107675 D0 19940227; JP 3895785 B2 20070322; JP H07195208 A 19950801; KR 100358661 B1 20030225; PL 176073 B1 19990430; PL 305864 A1 19950529; RU 2128562 C1 19990410; RU 94042254 A 19970420; TW 264412 B 19951201; US 5697271 A 19971216; US 5799554 A 19980901; US RE43534 E 20120724; US RE43718 E 20121009; ZA 9409186 B 19950725

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20141116

2015-02-24 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20141114

2015-01-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20150126

2015-01-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK07

- Ref Document Number: 192372

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20141115

2014-12-10 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20141114

2014-11-26 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: V4

- Effective date: 20141115

2014-11-18 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69424258

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-11-15 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69424258

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-11-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131108

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131118

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130918

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131003

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131009

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130910

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131003

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130913

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130911

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-07-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20110616

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091115

2007-05-18 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2007-05-18 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2007-02-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2007-01-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: NEW ISCAR LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

- Effective date: 20061012

2007-01-02 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: ISCAR LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT1

2006-09-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ISCAR LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2006-09-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: NEW ISCAR LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2006-06-02 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2006-03-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

2006-01-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20051026

2006-01-02 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR3

2005-11-22 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: RPEO

2005-11-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2005-10-26 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20051026

2005-10-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2005-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: CERATIZIT AUSTRIA GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H.

2005-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: CERATIZIT DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2005-07-06 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: CERATIZIT AUSTRIA GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20000616

2005-07-06 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: CERATIZIT DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Effective date: 20010203

2005-06-24 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1004206

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2005-04-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: CERATIZIT AUSTRIA AG

2005-04-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: CERATIZIT DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2005-02-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: CERATIZIT AUSTRIA AG

- Effective date: 20000616

2005-02-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: CERATIZIT DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Effective date: 20010203

2004-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: CERATIZIT AUSTRIA AG

2004-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: CERATIZIT DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

2004-07-28 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: CERATIZIT AUSTRIA AG

- Effective date: 20000616

2004-07-28 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: CERATIZIT DEUTSCHLAND GMBH

- Effective date: 20010203

2004-07-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: CERATIZIT AUSTRIA AG

2004-07-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: CERATIZIT AUSTRIA GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H.

2004-05-06 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: CERATIZIT AUSTRIA AG

- Effective date: 20000616

2004-05-06 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: CERATIZIT AUSTRIA GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20010203

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: PLANSEE TIZIT AG

2001-07-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: PLANSEE TIZIT GMBH

2001-05-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: PLANSEE TIZIT AG

- Effective date: 20000616

2001-05-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: PLANSEE TIZIT GMBH

- Effective date: 20010203

2000-10-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: PLANSEE TIZIT AG

2000-08-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: PLANSEE TIZIT AG

- Effective date: 20000616

2000-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2145802

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69424258

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-08

2000-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 192372

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-02-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO INGG. FISCHETTI & WEBER

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1997-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19961216

1996-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19951114

1995-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE