Global Patent Index - EP 0654434 B1

EP 0654434 B1 2000-04-05 - Device for pressing folded, printed articles such as newspapers, magazines and parts thereof

Title (en)

Device for pressing folded, printed articles such as newspapers, magazines and parts thereof

Title (de)

Pressvorrichtung für gefaltete Druckereierzeugnisse wie Zeitungen, Zeitschriften und Teilen hievon

Title (fr)

Dispositif de pressage pour des articles imprimés pliés tels que journaux, magazines et des parties de ceux-ci

Publication

EP 0654434 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94114909 A

Priority

CH 346193 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0654434A1] The printed products (33) to be pressed run in an imbricated formation (S), in which the folding edges (33a) of the printed products (33) are on top, through between the press rollers (3, 4, 5, 6) of two pairs of press rollers (1, 2) arranged in succession. The upper press rollers (3, 5) of each pair of press rollers (1, 2), which come into contact directly with the folding edges (33a), are fixedly mounted. Opposite these, the other press rollers (4, 6) of each pair of press rollers (1, 2) are mounted on each side in a common mounting (15) supported flexibly on pneumatic springs (16). The press rollers (3, 4, 5, 6) are driven individually via elastic drive belts (17, 18, 19, 20). As a result of these measures, the printed products (33) can be pressed perfectly and with care, even at a high conveying speed. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/12; B65H 29/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 25/00 (2006.01); B65H 29/12 (2006.01); B65H 29/66 (2006.01); B65H 45/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/66 (2013.01); B65H 29/12 (2013.01); B65H 2404/261 (2013.01); B65H 2404/2614 (2013.01); B65H 2515/34 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1932 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B65H 2515/34 + B65H 2220/02

Citation (examination)

DE 3529570 A1 19860313 - POLYGRAPH LEIPZIG [DD]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0654434 A1 19950524; EP 0654434 B1 20000405; AT 191428 T 20000415; AU 664954 B2 19951207; AU 7439194 A 19950615; CA 2135658 A1 19950520; CA 2135658 C 19980901; DE 59409267 D1 20000511; DK 0654434 T3 20000710; ES 2144024 T3 20000601; JP 2593631 B2 19970326; JP H07195667 A 19950801; US 5542349 A 19960806

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140923

2015-01-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20150108

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140921

2014-11-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK07

- Ref Document Number: 191428

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20140922

2014-11-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140923

2014-10-15 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20140921

2014-10-01 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: V4

- Effective date: 20140922

2014-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2014-09-29 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUP

- Effective date: 20140922

2014-09-23 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59409267

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130930

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131204

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130918

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130927

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130919

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130918

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130911

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-02-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FERAG AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-10 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2144024

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59409267

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-11

2000-04-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-04-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 191428

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-03-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1995-08-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19950622

1995-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950329

1995-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE