Global Patent Index - EP 0654567 B1

EP 0654567 B1 2000-03-22 - Roof glazing system

Title (en)

Roof glazing system

Title (de)

Dachverglasungssystem

Title (fr)

Système de vitrage d'une toiture

Publication

EP 0654567 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94117905 A

Priority

DE 4339467 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4339467C1] The glazing system in the case of which fixed (2) and outwardly pivotable (3) glass elements are fitted on a frame substructure (4) comprising metal profiles. The pivotable glass elements, serving as window (3), exhibit, on a window-frame substructure (10), a sealing profile (14) which runs around the periphery of the window and has a water-discharge channel (15) running around the interior. The sealing profile (14) is configured such that, when the window is closed, the surface (26) of the sealing profile terminates flush with the upper side (25) of the glass pane (11), in order to channel away over the window the water which is running down from the roof. In addition, the sides of the glass panes rest in a sealing manner against the sealing profile and the glass pane forms, with its border region (20), a wall of the water-discharge channel (15). In addition, the glass pane is fastened pivotably on the sealing profile (14) via at least one hinge with a pivot point (28) located on the upper side of the glass pane. This construction achieves a situation where the window (3) only projects to a small extent (not more than 8 mm) out of the plane of the fixed glass elements (2), with the result that the visual appearance is considerably improved. Furthermore, the manufacture and mounting are simplified to a considerable extent (Figure 2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 3/08; E04D 3/06; E04D 13/035

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 3/06 (2006.01); E04D 3/08 (2006.01); E06B 3/64 (2006.01); E06B 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/325 (2013.01); E04D 3/06 (2013.01); E04D 3/08 (2013.01); E06B 3/645 (2013.01); E06B 7/14 (2013.01); E04D 2003/0831 (2013.01); E04D 2003/0868 (2013.01); E04D 2003/0887 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 4339467 C1 19950323; AT 191044 T 20000415; EP 0654567 A2 19950524; EP 0654567 A3 19960710; EP 0654567 B1 20000322

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051112

2003-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2002-09-06 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-08-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020730

2001-11-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011112

2001-11-09 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20011109

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-10 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20001110

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-10-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20001023

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BARTH & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2000-06-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR IT LI

2000-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191044 T 20000415

1999-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990709

1997-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970110

1996-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR IT LI

1995-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR IT LI