Global Patent Index - EP 0654575 B1

EP 0654575 B1 2000-11-15 - Safety contact edge with protective coating

Title (en)

Safety contact edge with protective coating

Title (de)

Sicherheitskontaktschiene mit Schutzschicht

Title (fr)

Rail de contact de sécurité avec une couche protective

Publication

EP 0654575 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 94102652 A

Priority

DE 4339688 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0654575A1] Known safety contact rails have a securing strip (1), a sheath part (3) and an inner element (5) arranged therein. In this arrangement, the inner element (5) and the sheath part (3) are designed to be electrically conductive and, in the case of mutual contact, trigger a switching pulse which can be fed to an evaluation unit. As a result of the electrically conductive construction, the sheath part can be more easily damaged than other parts and can also effect false triggering. Since, as a result, the surface is also electrically conductive, the accidental transfer of voltage to control units connected downstream is also possible. As a result of coating the sheath part (3) with an electrically non-conductive outer protective layer (6), which is preferably produced by means of extrusion together with the securing strip (1), the inner element designed as a knife-like rib (5) and the sheath part (3), faulty triggering as a result of, for example, contamination of the sheath part (3) is excluded. Likewise, the protective layer (6) can be deliberately designed to be resistant to specific damaging surface influences, which can for example be given by acids, without the electrical conductivity of the sheath part (3) being influenced in a disadvantageous manner. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 15/00; H01H 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60J 10/00 (2006.01); E05F 15/00 (2006.01); F16P 3/12 (2006.01); H01H 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/142 (2013.01); B60J 10/00 (2013.01); E05F 15/44 (2013.01); F16P 3/12 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/40 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/132 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0654576 A1 19950524; EP 0654576 B1 19980318; AT 164202 T 19980415; AT 197626 T 20001215; DE 4339688 A1 19950524; EP 0654575 A1 19950524; EP 0654575 B1 20001115; ES 2113597 T3 19980501; ES 2151909 T3 20010116; PT 654575 E 20010330

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060223

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060210

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-11-21 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2006-10-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20060309

2006-09-29 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20060718

2006-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-07-26 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20060309

2006-07-26 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20060309

2006-05-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060526

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-02-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060227

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-02-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060223

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-02-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060217

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-02-16 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060216

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-02-15 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20060215

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-02-14 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060214

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-02-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060214

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-02-10 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060210

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-02-07 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20060207

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-02-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050222

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: MAYSER GMBH & CO.

2001-12-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SUHNER AG

2001-09-26 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MAYSER GMBH & CO.

- Effective date: 20010804

2001-09-26 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HUBER + SUHNER AG

- Effective date: 20010804

2001-03-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20001221

2001-03-12 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-02-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010202

2001-01-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. C. GREGORJ S.P.A.

2001-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2151909 T3

2000-12-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409586 20001221

2000-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197626 T 20001215

1998-06-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980422

1995-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950831

1995-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE