Global Patent Index - EP 0654705 B1

EP 0654705 B1 2000-06-21 - Photographic processing composition and method of photographic processing using the same

Title (en)

Photographic processing composition and method of photographic processing using the same

Title (de)

Photographische Verarbeitungszusammensetzung und Verarbeitungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Composition de traitement photographique et méthode de traitement photographique utilisant cette composition

Publication

EP 0654705 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94118434 A

Priority

  • JP 31576993 A
  • JP 31579093 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0654705A2] A photographic processing solution for silver halide light-sensitive materials containing a compound of formula (l): <CHEM> wherein R1 represents an aliphatic group, etc.; R2, R3, and R4 represents a hydrogen atom, etc.; L1, W1, W2 each represents an alkylene group, etc.; and A1 and A2 each represents a carboxyl group, etc., or a chelate of this compound with Fe (lll), etc. The processing solution can be prevented from deterioration due to incorporated and accumulated metal ions or growth of mold or bacteria. Both the compound (l) and its metal chelate are biodegradable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 5/26; G03C 7/407

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 5/26 (2006.01); G03C 5/305 (2006.01); G03C 7/407 (2006.01); G03C 7/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 5/3053 (2013.01); G03C 5/26 (2013.01); G03C 7/407 (2013.01); G03C 7/42 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0599620 A1 19940601 - KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0654705 A2 19950524; EP 0654705 A3 19961204; EP 0654705 B1 20000621; DE 69424983 D1 20000727; DE 69424983 T2 20001019

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101123

2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-09-08 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69424983

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-09-08 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69424983

- Effective date: 20110601

2011-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101123

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091118

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091029

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-05-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-11-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69424983 20000727

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2000-06-21 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-06-21 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-06-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000621

1998-01-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971216

1997-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970409

1996-12-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

1996-12-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT

1995-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

1995-05-24 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: LT