Global Patent Index - EP 0654710 B1

EP 0654710 B1 2001-03-28 - Photographic processing apparatus

Title (en)

Photographic processing apparatus

Title (de)

Photographisches Behandlungsgerät

Title (fr)

Appareil de traitement photographique

Publication

EP 0654710 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94203042 A

Priority

  • EP 94203042 A
  • EP 93203182 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0654710A1] Apparatus (10) for processing photographic material and which comprises a process bath filled with a liquid delivered from a storage container (15), the storage container (15) being placed on a trolley (50) and connected to the bath by a push-in/pull-out cap (30) engagable with the mouth of said container and having a passageway connected by conduits to the process bath (12, 13), the cap (30) and conduits connected thereto being mounted on a support plate (42) pivoted to a frame (46) of the apparatus so that the cap - (30) can be raised and lowered into and out of the mouth of the container (15). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03D 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 7/02 (2010.01); G03D 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 7/0288 (2013.01); G03D 3/06 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

WO 9102684 A1 19910307 - GIBSON CHEM LTD [AU]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0654710 A1 19950524; EP 0654710 B1 20010328

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050926

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061020

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061020

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2005-09-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050926

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-09-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050926

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-02-12 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20030120

2002-03-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-20 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-08-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69426968 20010503

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2001-03-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010328

1998-03-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980211

1996-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19951124

1995-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL